EP3720413 - ZINC/AMINO ACID-FUNCTIONALIZED SILICA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOVOY, Viktor 29 Cherry Court Cresskill, NJ 07626 / US | 02 /
BRINZARI, Tatiana c/o Colgate-Palmolive Company Global Technology Center 909 River Road Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | 03 /
STRANICK, Michael 2 Black Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
PAN, Long 3 Staudt Court Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 05 /
SUBRAMANYAM, Ravi 18 Doyle Lane Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/42] | 01 /
DUBOVOY, Viktor 29 Cherry Court Cresskill, New Jersey 07626 / US | ||
02 /
BRINZARI, Tatiana c/o Colgate-Palmolive Company Global Technology Center 909 River Road Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | |||
03 /
STRANICK, Michael 2 Black Court Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
04 /
PAN, Long 3 Staudt Court Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | |||
05 /
SUBRAMANYAM, Ravi 18 Doyle Lane Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18819514.3 | 30.11.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018US63407 | Priority number, date | US201762594685P | 05.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762594685 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019112904 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720413 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/27, A61K8/25, A61K8/02, A61Q11/00, A61K8/44, C01B33/18 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
C01B33/18 (EP,US);
A61K8/0279 (EP,US);
A61K8/21 (US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (US);
A61K2800/622 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/42] | A61K8/27, A61K8/44, A61Q11/00, A61K8/02, A61K8/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | ZINK/AMINOSÄURE-FUNKTIONALISIERTE KIESELSÄURE | [2020/42] | English: | ZINC/AMINO ACID-FUNCTIONALIZED SILICA | [2020/42] | French: | SILICE FONCTIONNALISÉE ACIDE AMINÉ/ZINC | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 24.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5413844 (PERSELLO JACQUES [FR]); | [XY]WO2014098826 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [A]WO2017117500 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) | by applicant | US3535421 | US3538230 | US3678154 | US3862307 | US3937807 | US3959458 | US4051234 | US4340583 | US4885155 | US5188821 | US5192531 | US2015328118 | US2015328110 | US2015328117 | US2015335554 | US2015335553 |