EP3643501 - INKJET RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMAZOE, Masanori c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18820423.4 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018JP22388 | Priority number, date | JP20170121047 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017121047 | [2020/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018235673 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3643501 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3643501 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/015, B41J2/045, B41J2/14 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B41J2/04516 (EP);
B41J2/04541 (US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP);
B41J2/04595 (EP);
B41J2/04596 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/18] | English: | INKJET RECORDING DEVICE | [2020/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2019 | Translation filed | 23.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 14.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.06.2022 | AT | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.09.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013083106 (TSUKAMOTO RYUJI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0046] , [0055] , [0163]; figures 2,9 *; | [X]JP2014065149 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1,2* paragraphs [0077] - [0083]; figures 7,8 * | International search | [XY]JP2001162840 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0097]-[0103], fig. 1-6 & US 6517176 B1, column 14, fig. 1-6 & EP 1088662 A2 & EP 2374620 A1 * [Y] 3-5, 7; | [A]JP2001191517 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0031] (Family: none) *; | [A]US2005088468 (CLARK JAMES E [US]) [A] 1-7* , paragraph [0012], fig. 2-5 & WO 2005/069759 A2 & CA 2544356 A1 *; | [Y]JP2012045797 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 3-5, 7 * , paragraphs [0046]-[0065], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2014185142 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [Y] 4-5, 7 * , paragraphs [0060]-[0064], fig. 5-6 & US 2016/0082723 A1, paragraphs [0076]-[0081], fig. 5-6 & EP 2998119 A1 * | by applicant | JP2012045797 |