EP3644684 - USER EQUIPMENT AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | For all designated states FG INNOVATION COMPANY LIMITED Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road, Tuen Mun New Territories Hong Kong / HK | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories / HK | |||
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Fangying c/o SHARP UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY (SHANGHAI) CO., LTD. No. 1111 Jinhai Rd. Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Renmao c/o SHARP UNIVERSAL TECHNOLOGY (SHANGHAI) CO., LTD. No. 1111 Jinhai Rd. Pudong Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [2024/41] |
Former [2020/18] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18820802.9 | 20.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018CN92029 | Priority number, date | CN201710483848 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710483848 | [2020/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018233639 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644684 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3644684 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/19, H04W80/02, H04W36/00, // H04W76/15 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (CN,US);
H04L1/08 (US);
H04L41/06 (US);
H04L43/0811 (CN);
H04W36/00692 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | H04W76/19, // H04W36/28, H04W80/02, H04W76/15 | ||
Former IPC [2020/18] | H04W76/15, H04W36/28, H04W80/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERAUSRÜSTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2020/18] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT AND RELATED METHOD | [2020/18] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2019 | Translation filed | 18.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012281548 (LIN SHIANG-JIUN [TW], et al); | [X]WO2014206489 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]); | International search | [A]US2016044639 (YI SEUNGJUNE [KR], et al); | [A]WO2016114587 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]CN105814957 (SHARP KK); | [A]CN106537882 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); |