EP3720279 - MICE HAVING AN ENGINEERED IMMUNOGLOBULIN LAMBDA LIGHT CHAIN AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/42] | NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING AN ENGINEERED IMMUNOGLOBULIN LAMBDA LIGHT CHAIN AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Andrew J. c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 02 /
MACDONALD, Lynn c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 03 /
GUO, Chunguang c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | 04 /
MCWHIRTER, John c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/38] |
Former [2020/42] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18821945.5 | 04.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018US63841 | Priority number, date | US201762594946P | 05.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762594946 P | US201762594944P | 05.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762594944 P | US201762609241P | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609241 P | US201762609251P | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609251 P | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019113065 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720279 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3720279 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C07K16/00, C07K16/46, C12N9/12 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A01K67/0278 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K67/0275 (CN,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K16/461 (CN,IL,US);
C07K16/462 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N5/0606 (CN);
C12N9/1264 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2207/15 (CN,IL,US);
A01K2217/052 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/15 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Extension states | BA | 03.04.2020 | ME | 03.04.2020 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÄUSE MIT MANIPULIERTER IMMUNOGLOBULIN-LAMBDA-LEICHTKETTE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/15] | English: | MICE HAVING AN ENGINEERED IMMUNOGLOBULIN LAMBDA LIGHT CHAIN AND USES THEREOF | [2022/15] | French: | SOURIS PRÉSENTANT UNE CHAÎNE LÉGÈRE D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE LAMBDA MODIFIÉE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/15] |
Former [2020/42] | NICHTMENSCHLICHE TIERE MIT MANIPULIERTER IMMUNOGLOBULIN-LAMBDA-LEICHTKETTE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | ||
Former [2020/42] | NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING AN ENGINEERED IMMUNOGLOBULIN LAMBDA LIGHT CHAIN AND USES THEREOF | ||
Former [2020/42] | ANIMAUX NON HUMAINS PRÉSENTANT UNE CHAÎNE LÉGÈRE D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE LAMBDA MODIFIÉE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 03.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22188627.8 / EP4140297 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02066630 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013096142 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]); | [Y]WO2013116609 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]); | [XYI]WO2015049517 (KYMAB LTD [GB]); | [IY]EP3051942 (KYMAB LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US5670356 | US5874304 | US2002088016 | US6586251 | US2003217373 | US6998514 | US2007280945 | US7435871 | US7582298 | US2011236378 | US2013096287 | US8502018 | US8642835 | US8697940 | US8791323 | US2014235933 | US2014310828 | US9006511 | US9012717 | US9029628 | US9035128 | US9066502 | US9150662 | US9163092 | US2016145646 | US2017204430 | US9738897 | WO2017210586 |