EP3646908 - NEEDLELESS SYRINGE, METHOD FOR ADJUSTING FINALLY REACHED DEPTH OF NEEDLELESS SYRINGE, AND EJECTION PARAMETER CALCULATION PROGRAM FOR NEEDLELESS SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Corporation 3-1, Ofuka-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0011 / JP | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takamasa c/o DAICEL CORPORATION 805 Umaba Ibogawa-cho Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 671-1681 / JP | 02 /
ATOBE, Shingo c/o DAICEL CORPORATION The Center of Medical Innovation and Translational Research 709 2-2 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Hiroshi c/o DAICEL CORPORATION The Center of Medical Innovation and Translational Research 709 2-2 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 04 /
IGA, Hiromitsu c/o DAICEL CORPORATION 805 Umaba Ibogawa-cho Tatsuno-shi Hyogo 671-1681 / JP | 05 /
MIKI, Katsuya c/o DAICEL CORPORATION The Center of Medical Innovation and Translational Research 709 2-2 Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18823047.8 | 27.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018JP24466 | Priority number, date | JP20170125672 | 27.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017125672 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019004322 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646908 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/30, A61M5/46, A61M5/48, // A61M5/20 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/30 (EP,US);
A61M5/2046 (EP,US);
A61M5/2053 (US);
A61M5/46 (EP);
A61M5/482 (EP);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | A61M5/303 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | NADELLOSE SPRITZE, VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER ENDSTÄNDIGEN TIEFE EINER NADELLOSEN SPRITZE UND EJEKTIONSPARAMETERBERECHNUNGSPROGRAMM FÜR NADELLOSE SPRITZE | [2020/19] | English: | NEEDLELESS SYRINGE, METHOD FOR ADJUSTING FINALLY REACHED DEPTH OF NEEDLELESS SYRINGE, AND EJECTION PARAMETER CALCULATION PROGRAM FOR NEEDLELESS SYRINGE | [2020/19] | French: | SERINGUE SANS AIGUILLE, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE FINAL DE LA PROFONDEUR DE SERINGUE SANS AIGUILLE, ET PROGRAMME DE CALCUL DE PARAMÈTRE D'ÉJECTION POUR SERINGUE SANS AIGUILLE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2020 | Translation filed | 22.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012065615 (BOYD BROOKS [US], et al); | [A]US2012089114 (HEMOND BRIAN D [US], et al); | [A]US2015057607 (ODA SHINGO [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2004520884 (BIOVALVE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.) [A] 1-10* , paragraphs [0120], [0152], fig. 30-32, 49-54 & US 2002/0151842 A1, paragraphs [0174], [0206], fig. 30-32, 4954 & WO 2002/051470 A2 *; | [XY]JP2012065922 (DAICEL CORP) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0039]-[0074], [0077]-[0080], fig. 1, 4-7 & US 2014/0200512 A1, paragraphs [0054]-[0090], [0100]-[0102], fig. 1, 4-7 & WO 2012/039458 A1 & EP 2620175 A1 & CN 103209725 A * [Y] 5-10; | [Y]US2013304017 (WILLIAMSON DANIEL E [US]) [Y] 5-10 * , paragraphs [0007]-[0009], [0026]-[0032], [0039]-[0048], [0055]-[0064], fig. 2-7 & WO 2013/169946 A1 * | by applicant | WO0131282 | JP2003025950 | JP2005021640 | JP2008206477 | JP2012061269 |