EP3645012 - MODIFIED UBE3A GENE FOR A GENE THERAPY APPROACH FOR ANGELMAN SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of South Florida 3802 Spectrum Blvd., Suite 100 Tampa, FL 33612 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASH, Kevin Ron 6215 Soaring Avenue Temple Terrace Florida 33617 / US | 02 /
WEEBER, Edwin John 5407 Conch Shell Place Apollo Beach Florida 33572 / US | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18823174.0 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018US39980 | Priority number, date | US201762525787P | 28.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762525787 P | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019006107 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645012 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/711, C12N15/85, C12P19/34 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP);
A61K35/761 (US);
A61K31/711 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61K48/0066 (US);
A61P25/28 (US);
C07K14/62 (US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12Y603/02019 (EP);
C12N2750/14143 (EP);
C12N2810/40 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/711, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES UBE3A-GEN FÜR EINEN GENTHERAPIEANSATZ FÜR EIN ANGELMAN-SYNDROM | [2020/19] | English: | MODIFIED UBE3A GENE FOR A GENE THERAPY APPROACH FOR ANGELMAN SYNDROME | [2020/19] | French: | GÈNE UBE3A MODIFIÉ POUR UNE APPROCHE DE THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE DU SYNDROME D'ANGELMAN | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 29.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009082265 (BARTEL PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0386] , [0402] *; | [Y]US2013164845 (POLACH KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-11* paragraphs [0031] , [0165] , [0208] *; | [Y]WO2015138628 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [Y] 1-11 * examples 1,5 *; | [Y]WO2016179584 (UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * example 5 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US2016376325 (MCFADDEN DOUGLAS GRANT [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0009] , [0049]; example 5 *; | [Y]WO2017048466 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 1-11 * example 54 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US2017088593 (ILDEFONSO CRISTHIAN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0041] , [0065] , [0078] * | International search | [X]WO2016179584 (UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * ; page 1, lines 9-11; page 5, lines 1-4; page 7, lines 1-12; page 13, lines 1-5; page 16, line 11; page 18, lines 9-13; page 24, lines 11-18; claims 1-10, 14-15 *; | [A] - TOMAIC, V et al., "Angelman syndrome-associated ubiquitin ligase UBE3A/E6 AP mutants interfere with the proteolytic activity of the proteasome", Cell Death and Disease, (20150129), vol. 6, pages 1 - 8, XP055495045 [A] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cddis.2014.572 | [A] - DAILY, JL et al., "Adeno-Associated Virus-Mediated Rescue of the Cognitive Defects in a Mouse Model for Angelman Syndrome", PLOS ONE, (20111209), vol. 6, no. 12, page e27221, XP055556286 [A] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0027221 | by applicant | US2013317018 | EP2724721 | WO2016179584 | - CLAYTON-SMITH, "Clinical research on Angelman syndrome in the United Kingdom: observations on 82 affected individuals", Am J Med Genet., (19930401), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 12 - 5 | - NICHOLLS, "New insights reveal complex mechanisms involved in genomic imprinting", Am J Hum Genet., (19940500), vol. 54, no. 5, pages 733 - 40 | - KISHINO et al., "UBE3A/E6-AP mutations cause Angelman syndrome", Nat Gen., (19970115), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 70 - 3 | - ALBRECHT et al., "Imprinted expression of the murine Angelman syndrome gene, Ube3a, in hippocampal and Purkinje neurons", Nat Genet., (19970900), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 75 - 8 | - TONAZZINI et al., "Impaired neurite contract guidance in ubuitin ligase E3a (Ube3a)-deficient hippocampal neurons on nanostructured substrates", Adv Healthc Mater., (20160400), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 850 - 62 | - KAPLAN et al., "Clinical heterogeneity associated with deletions in the long arm of chromosome 15: report of 3 new cases and their possible significance", Am J Med Genet., (19870900), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 45 - 53 | - BUITING et al., "Inherited microdeletions in the Angelman and Prader-Willi syndromes define an imprinting centre on human chromosome 15", Nat Genet., (19950400), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 395 - 400 | - GABRIEL et al., "A transgene insertion creating a heritable chromosome deletion mouse model of Prader-Willi and Angelman syndrome", Proc Natl Acad Sci U.S.A., (19990800), vol. 96, no. 16, pages 9258 - 63 | - KNOLL et al., "Angelman and Prader-Willi syndromes share a common chromosome 15 deletion but differ in parental origin of the deletion", Am J Med Genet., (19890000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 285 - 90 | - MALCOLM et al., "Uniparental paternal disomy in Angelman's syndrome", Lancet., (19910323), vol. 337, no. 8743, pages 694 - 7 | - HUIBREGTSE et al., "A cellular protein mediates association of p53 with the E6 oncoprotein of human papillomavirus types 16 or18", EMBO J., (19911200), vol. 10, no. 13, pages 4129 - 35 | - KUMAR et al., "Identification of HHR23A as a substrate for E6-associated protein-mediated ubiquitination", J Biol Chem., (19990625), vol. 274, no. 26, pages 18785 - 92 | - NUBER et al., "The ubiquitin-protein ligase E6-associated protein (E6-AP) serves as its own substrate", Eur J Biochem., (19980615), vol. 254, no. 3, pages 643 - 9 | - GREER et al., "The Angelman Syndrome protein Ube3A regulates synapse Development by ubiquitinating arc", Cell, (20100305), vol. 140, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2010.01.026, pages 704 - 16, XP055057176 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2010.01.026 | - JIANG et al., "Mutation of the Angelman ubiquitin ligase in mice causes increased cytoplasmic p53 and deficits of contextual learning and long-term potentiation", Neuron, (19981000), vol. 21, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0896-6273(00)80596-6, pages 799 - 811, XP002122380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(00)80596-6 | - DAVIES et al., "Imprinted gene expression in the brain", Neurosci Biobehav Rev., (20050500), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.neubiorev.2004.11.007, pages 421 - 430, XP004834425 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neubiorev.2004.11.007 | - WEEBER et al., "Derangements of hippocampal calcium/calmodulin-dependent protein kinase II in a mouse model for Angelman mental retardation syndrome", J Neurosci., (20030400), vol. 23, no. 7, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.23-07-02634.2003, pages 2634 - 44, XP055734700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.23-07-02634.2003 | - BAYER et al., "Developmental expression of the CaM kinase II isoforms: ubiquitous γ- and δ-CaM kinase II are the early isoforms and most abundant in the developing nervous system", Brain Res Mol Brain Res., (19990618), vol. 70, no. 1, pages 147 - 54 | - MAHESHWARI et al., "Deficiency of Ube3a in Huntington's disease mice brain increases aggregate load and accelerates disease pathology", Hum Mol Genet., (20141201), vol. 23, no. 23, pages 6235 - 45 | - GARG S. et al., "The hybrid cytomegalovirus enhancer/chicken beta-actin promotor along with woodchuck hepatitis virus posttranscriptional regulatory element enhances the protective efficacy of DNA vaccines", J. Immunol., (20040701), vol. 173, no. 1, pages 550 - 558, XP002445286 | - HIGASHIMOTO, T. et al., The woodchuck hepatitis virus post-transcriptional regulatory element reduces readthrough transcription from retroviral vectors, (20070900), vol. 14, no. 17, pages 1298 - 304 | - COOPER, A.R. et al., "Rescue of splicing-mediated intron loss maximizes expression in lentiviral vectors containing the human ubiquitin C promoter", Nucleic Acids Res., (20150100), vol. 43, no. 1, doi:10.1093/nar/gku1312, pages 682 - 90, XP055343862 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gku1312 | - GUSTIN et al., "Tissue-specific variation of Ube3a protein expression in rodents and in a mouse model of Angelman syndrome", Neurobiol Dis., (20100900), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 283 - 91 | - HECK et al., "Analysis of cerebellar function in Ube3a-deficient mice reveals novel genotype-specific behaviors", Hum Mol Genet., (20080715), vol. 17, no. 14, pages 2181 - 9 | - LI et al., "Intra-ventricular infusion of rAAV-1-EGFP resulted in transduction in multiple regions of adult rat brain: a comparative study with rAAV2 and rAAV5 vectors", Brain Res., (20061129), vol. 1122, no. 1, pages 1 - 9 |