EP3645165 - A MICROFLUIDIC CHIP AND A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MICROFLUIDIC CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Teknologian Tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAANINEN, Tiina c/o VTT P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | 02 /
KOKKONEN, Annukka c/o VTT P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | 03 /
KURKINEN, Marika c/o VTT P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | 04 /
AIKIO, Sanna c/o VTT P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18823238.3 | 25.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018FI50492 | Priority number, date | FI20170005637 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: FI 20175637 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002678 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645165 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B81C1/00, B81C3/00, G01F11/28, G01N33/543, G01N35/00 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,FI,US);
B01L3/502723 (FI);
B01L3/502746 (EP,FI,US);
B81B1/002 (FI);
B81B1/004 (FI);
B81B1/006 (US);
B81C1/00119 (US);
G01N35/1016 (FI);
B01L2200/0605 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (US);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/123 (EP,US);
B01L2300/165 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0688 (EP,US);
B81B2201/05 (US);
B81B2203/0338 (US);
B81C2201/015 (US);
B81C2203/03 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHER CHIP UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MIKROFLUIDISCHEN CHIPS | [2020/19] | English: | A MICROFLUIDIC CHIP AND A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MICROFLUIDIC CHIP | [2020/19] | French: | PUCE MICROFLUIDIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PUCE MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 07.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0293519 (BROWN JAMES F) [X] 1,2,5,6,11,12,14,15 * page 8, line 7 - line 56; figures 12 - 14 * * page 9, line 46 - line 53 * [Y] 3,4,9,10,13 [I] 7,8; | [Y]US2011008210 (KURKINEN MARIKA [FI], et al) [Y] 16-19* paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]US2015024477 (MORI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0046]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2015147777 (DOTHIE PAMELA ANN [GB]) [Y] 13 * paragraph 21 - pages 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2016167042 (TYRRELL STEVEN PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 16-19 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0139] *; | [Y] - TAE HO KANG ET AL, "Portable multi-immunosensing lab-on-a-chip (LOC) triggered by air bladder", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, 1000 20th St. Bellingham WA 98225-6705 USA, (20071210), vol. 6799, doi:10.1117/12.759333, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-3927-0, page 67991C, XP055569192 [Y] 3,4,10 * Section "2.1 Structure"; pages C-3; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.759333 | International search | [A]WO9919717 (ACLARA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract; page 17, lines 13-16; from page 21, line 1 to page 23, line 17; figures 5 and 6 *; | [Y]US6911183 (HANDIQUE KALYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15, 19 * column 14, lines 31-57; figures 3a and 3b *; | [XY]US2010143194 (LEE DAE-SIK [KR], et al) [X] 16-18 * abstract; paragraphs [0025]-[0036]; figures 1-6c; claims 1, 12, 13 * [Y] 1-15, 19; | [A]US2011008210 (KURKINEN MARIKA [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0015], [0036], [0037], [0046]-[0049]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2011108333 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * figures 2 and 5 & abstract [online] EPOQUENET EPODOC & WPI & machine translation into English by EPO [online] EPOQUENET TXPMTEA, page 5, lines 35-41; page 7, lines 40-42; from page 8, line 38 to page 9, line 14 *; | [Y]US2012196280 (KARLSEN FRANK [NO], et al) [Y] 1-15, 19 * paragraphs [0098], [0111], [0112]; figure 5; claims 3-5 *; | [A]US2015024477 (MORI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19* paragraphs [0046], [0117], [0118]; figures 3 and 13 *; | [Y]EP2658653 (ABBOTT POINT OF CARE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15, 19 * paragraphs [0013], [0014], [0038], [0053], [0058]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2016069091 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract; figure 1 a *; | [Y]EP2363207 (HANDYLAB INC [US]) [Y] 1-15, 19 * paragraphs [0045], [0141]-[0144]; figures 1, 8a, and 8b *; | [A] - FEYSSA, B. et al., "Patterned Immobilization of Antibodies within Roll- to-Roll Hot Embossed Polymeric Microfluidic Channels", PLOS one, vol. 8, no. 7, (20130718), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://journals.plos.org/plosone/article?id=10.1371/journal.pone.0068918, (20180905), XP055569186 [A] 1-19 * abstract; page 2, right column, third paragraph; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0068918 | [A] - HAKALAHTI, L. et al., "Your lab on a chip - Roll-to-roll hot- embossed microfluidics for life sciences applications", Freedom of Design. Research, development and commercialisation highlights in Printed Intelligence 2011 - 2012, (20120000), pages 32 - 34, URL: https://www.vtt.fi/files/services/ele/printed_intelligence_2012_2.pdf, (20180907), XP055569190 [A] 1-19 * l the whole document; especially figures 1 and 2 * | [A] - KANG, T. H. et al., "Portable multi-immunosensing lab-on-a-chip (LOC) triggered by air bladder", BioMEMS and Nanotechnology III Conference, Canberra , Australia, (20071205), XP055569192 [A] 1-19 * abstract; figures 2 and 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.759333 | [A] - IWAI, K. et al., "Finger-powered microfluidic systems using multilayer soft lithography and injection molding processes", Lab on a Chip, (20140000), vol. 14, no. 19, pages 3790 - 3799, XP055569195 [A] 1-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4LC00500G |