EP3675118 - FIBER AGGREGATE FOR SOUND INSULATION, SOUND ABSORBING/INSULATING MATERIAL, AND SOUND ABSORBING/INSULATING MATERIAL FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-Techx Inc. 25-9, Shinkawa 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1040033 / JP | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOTA, Hiroyoshi M-TEchX Inc. Head Office 3-3-12, Keihinjima Otaku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | 02 /
IKEGAYA, Morihiko M-TEchX Inc. Head Office 3-3-12, Keihinjima Otaku Tokyo 143-0003 / JP | 03 /
URABE, Kenichi M-TEchX Inc. Head Office 3-3-12, Keihinjima Otaku Tokyo 143-0003 / JP | 04 /
ECHIZENYA, Takatsugu M-TEchX Inc. Head Office 3-3-12, Keihinjima Otaku Tokyo 1543-0003 / JP | 05 /
HIROGAKI, Toshiki Doshisha University 1-3 Tatara Miyakodani Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0394 / JP | 06 /
WU, Wei Doshisha University 1-3 Tatara Miyakodani Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0394 / JP | 07 /
ISHII, Yoshiaki M-TEchX Inc. Head Office 3-3-12, Keihinjima Otaku Tokyo 143-0003 / JP | [2020/42] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
SOTA, Hiroyoshi M-TEchX Inc. 25-11 Higashi 3-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
IKEGAYA, Morihiko M-TEchX Inc. 25-11 Higashi 3-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
URABE, Kenichi M-TEchX Inc. 25-11 Higashi 3-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
ECHIZENYA, Takatsugu M-TEchX Inc. 25-11 Higashi 3-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | |||
05 /
HIROGAKI, Toshiki Doshisha University 1-3 Tatara Miyakodani Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0394 / JP | |||
06 /
WU, Wei Doshisha University 1-3 Tatara Miyakodani Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0394 / JP | |||
07 /
ISHII, Yoshiaki M-TEchX Inc. 25-11 Higashi 3-Chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18824548.4 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018JP24744 | Priority number, date | US201762527761P | 30.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762527761 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019004408 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675118 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/28, B01J20/26, D04H1/72, G01N30/00, C09K3/32 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/28007 (KR,US);
B60R13/0815 (US);
B01J20/262 (EP);
B01J20/28004 (EP);
B01J20/28011 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28023 (KR,US);
B01J20/28038 (EP,US);
B01J20/3028 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
C02F1/283 (KR);
C02F1/40 (KR);
C09K3/32 (EP);
D04H1/72 (KR);
G01F22/00 (US);
G01N30/00 (KR);
G10K11/162 (EP);
G10K11/168 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
B32B2605/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | G10K11/162, B32B5/26, B60R13/08, G10K11/168 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | FASERAGGREGAT FÜR SCHALLDÄMMUNG, SCHALLDÄMMUNGS-/ISOLIERMATERIAL UND SCHALLDÄMMUNGS-/ISOLIERMATERIAL FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2020/27] | English: | FIBER AGGREGATE FOR SOUND INSULATION, SOUND ABSORBING/INSULATING MATERIAL, AND SOUND ABSORBING/INSULATING MATERIAL FOR VEHICLE | [2020/27] | French: | AGRÉGAT DE FIBRES POUR ISOLATION ACOUSTIQUE, MATÉRIAU D'ABSORPTION/ISOLATION ACOUSTIQUE ET MATÉRIAU D'ABSORPTION/ISOLATION ACOUSTIQUE POUR VÉHICULE | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | Translation filed | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/27] | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 03.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 20.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2014232281 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract *[I] 2,4; | [XI]WO2016158599 (ASAHI FIBREGLASS CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0026] * [I] 2,4; | [T] - Anonymous, "Bulk density - Wikipedia", (20050709), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Bulk_density, (20210506), XP055802181 [T] 1,3-5 * the whole document * | International search | [XA]JPH1120570 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1, 5-8 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0019], [0035]-[0036], [0041], fig, 1, 5 (Family: none) * [A] 9; | [X]JP2014037647 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0028], [0030] (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2014214398 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-4 * , claim 1, paragraph [0011] (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2015197601 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-4* , claim 1, paragraphs [0023], [0025] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS6047786B | JP2015065171 | JP2017181925 |