EP3645830 - PROVISION OF INTERNAL LINES IN A WELL TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford Technology Holdings, LLC 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOSKE, Joe 2000 St. James Place Houston, TX 77056 / US | 02 /
MCDOWELL, Christopher L. 11909 Spencer Road Houston, TX 77041 / US | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/19] | 01 /
NOSKE, Joe 2000 St. James Place Houston TX 77056 / US | ||
02 /
MCDOWELL, Christopher, L. 11909 Spencer Road Houston TX 77041 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/30] |
Former [2020/19] | Suckling, Andrew Michael Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18825095.5 | 30.03.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018US25452 | Priority number, date | US201715638885 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: US201715638885 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019005248 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645830 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645830 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/02, E21B33/03, E21B34/00, E21B34/06 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
E21B34/06 (EP,US);
E21B33/1275 (US);
E21B33/1285 (US);
E21B34/106 (US);
E21B2200/05 (EP,US);
E21B34/12 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | E21B34/02, E21B33/03, E21B34/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON INTERNEN LEITUNGEN IN EINEM BOHRLOCHWERKZEUG | [2020/19] | English: | PROVISION OF INTERNAL LINES IN A WELL TOOL | [2020/19] | French: | FOURNITURE DE LIGNES INTERNES DANS UN OUTIL DE PUITS | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 23.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3627048 (ROEDER GEORGE K); | [A]US4367794 (BEDNAR JOHN M, et al); | [A]WO03060280 (VARCO INT [US]); | [A]US2009277643 (MONDELLI MAXIMILIANO [US], et al) | International search | [A]EP0985798 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]); | [X]US6315047 (DEATON THOMAS M [US], et al); | [A]WO2006042060 (GEN OIL TOOLS L P [US], et al); | [A]EP1980711 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US]); | [A]US2008277119 (HILL JR THOMAS G [US], et al) | by applicant | US4367794 |