EP3646219 - DETECTING SYNTHETIC ONLINE ENTITIES FACILITATED BY PRIMARY ENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Equifax, Inc. 1550 Peachtree Street, N. W. Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Chris 4130 Blossom Street Columbia South Carolina 29205 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Rakesh 3417 Belridge Dr. SE Smyrna Georgia 30080 / US | 03 /
MULLINAX, John 3785 Meadow Crest Way Cumming Georgia 30040 / US | 04 /
COLE, Troy 5701 Fire Light Terrace Moseley Virginia 23120 / US | 05 /
FARACH, Julio 1654 Brookhaven Close NE Atlanta Georgia 30319 / US | 06 /
GRICE, Lee 1149 Knollwood Ct. Auburn Alabama 36830 / US | 07 /
WADKINS, Patrick 2262 Dartford Dr. Dunwoody Georgia 30338 / US | 08 /
STRONG, Erik 4430 Tilly Mill Rd. Unit 1407 Doraville Georgia 30360 / US | 09 /
BOYNES, Cordell 981 Sunhill Ct. Lawrenceville Georgia 30043 / US | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | ATIP Armstrong Teasdale Limited 38-43 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3PE / GB | [2024/02] |
Former [2020/19] | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18825395.9 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018US40245 | Priority number, date | US201762527660P | 30.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762527660 P | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019006272 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646219 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3646219 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/55, G06Q20/22, G06Q20/40 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP);
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
G06F16/2379 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP);
G06F21/62 (US);
G06Q20/227 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | H04L29/06, G06F21/55, G06F21/52, G06Q20/22, // G06Q20/40 | ||
Former IPC [2020/19] | G06F21/55, G06F21/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON SYNTHETISCHEN ONLINE-ENTITÄTEN DURCH PRIMÄRE ENTITÄTEN | [2020/19] | English: | DETECTING SYNTHETIC ONLINE ENTITIES FACILITATED BY PRIMARY ENTITIES | [2020/19] | French: | DÉTECTION D'ENTITÉS EN LIGNE SYNTHÉTIQUES FACILITÉES PAR DES ENTITÉS PRIMAIRES | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24150992.6 / EP4369275 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014108251 (ANDERSON ROBERT WHITNEY [US], et al); | [A]WO2014160296 (GUARDIAN ANALYTICS INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2016154419 (EQUIFAX INC [US]) | International search | [A]KR101364763B ; | [Y]US2014108251 (ANDERSON ROBERT WHITNEY [US], et al); | [A]US8799122 (DEL FAVERO JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]US2016210631 (RAMASUBRAMANIAN GUHA [IN], et al); | [YA]WO2016154419 (EQUIFAX INC [US]) | by applicant | WO2016154419 |