EP3727328 - LIPOSOMES COMPRISING SPHINGOMYELIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoMedica Holding AG Baarerstrasse 34 6300 Zug / CH | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALBHERR, Stéfan Gutenbergstrasse 11 3011 Bern / CH | 02 /
PEITSCH, Camille 3012 Bern / CH | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/48] | 01 /
HALBHERR, Stéfan Gutenbergstrasse 11 3011 Bern / CH | ||
02 /
Peitsch, Camille 3012 Bern / CH | |||
Former [2020/44] | 01 /
HALBHERR, Stéfan Gutenbergstrasse 11 3011 Bern / CH | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18825700.0 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP86352 | Priority number, date | EP20170209738 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17209738 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122220 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727328 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3727328 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K31/688, A61P25/28 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61K31/688 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | A61K9/00, A61K9/127 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIPOSOMEN MIT SPHINGOMYELIN | [2020/44] | English: | LIPOSOMES COMPRISING SPHINGOMYELIN | [2020/44] | French: | LIPOSOMES CONTENANT DE LA SPHINGOMYÉLINE | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/44] | LIPOSOMES COMPRENANT DE LA SPHINGOMYÉLINE | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 16.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24154120.0 / EP4335506 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007044748 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-16,18 * paragraphs [0144] - [0147] - [0160]; examples 2,3; claim 6 * [I] 9,17; | [XI]WO2009150686 (UNIV MILANO BICOCCA [IT], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11,16-18 * page 6, line 1; pages 7,10,11; claim 7 * [I] 7-9,12-15; | [XDI]US2014004172 (MASSERINI MASSIMO [IT], et al) [XD] 1-6,10,11,16-18 * example 1 *[I] 7-9,12-15 | Examination | - AGRAWAL MUKTA ET AL, "Recent advancements in liposomes targeting strategies to cross blood-brain barrier (BBB) for the treatment of Alzheimer's disease", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170524), vol. 260, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2017.05.019, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 61 - 77, XP085131033 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2017.05.019 | - M. Danaei ET AL, "Impact of Particle Size and Polydispersity Index on the Clinical Applications of Lipidic Nanocarrier Systems", Pharmaceutics, (20180518), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.3390/pharmaceutics10020057, page 57, XP055698595 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/pharmaceutics10020057 | - Magro Roberta Dal ET AL, "The ability of liposomes, tailored for blood-brain barrier targeting, to reach the brain is dramatically affected by the disease state", NANOMEDICINE, GB, (20180129), vol. 13, no. 6, doi:10.2217/nnm-2017-0317, ISSN 1743-5889, pages 585 - 594, XP055842256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/nnm-2017-0317 | by applicant | WO2007044748 | WO2008033253 | WO2009150686 | WO2014000857 | - N Engl J Med, (20170504), vol. 376, no. 18, pages 1706 - 1708 | - Nature, (20161123), vol. 540, no. 7631, pages 15 - 16 | - Alzheimers Dement, (20160200), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 110 - 120 | - J. Neurol. Sci., (20130000), vol. 324, no. 1-2, pages 140 - 148 | - Spinal Cord, (20130000), vol. 51, pages 2 - 9 | - Acta Ortop Bras, (20160500), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 123 - 6 | - Mol Neurobiol, (20170100), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 623 - 638 | - GIM MING ONG et al., "Evaluation of Extrusion Technique for Nanosizing Liposomes", Pharmaceutics, (20160000), vol. 36, no. 8, page 5 | - GIM MING ONG et al., "Evaluation of Extrusion Technique for Nanosizing Liposomes", Pharmaceutics, (20160000), vol. 36, no. 8 | - PERRIE et al., "Manufacturing Methods for Liposome Adjuvants, in; Vaccine Adjuvants", Methods and Protocols, Methods in Molecular Biology, (20170000), vol. 1494 |