EP3884377 - IN PLACE PATCH BUFFER OFFSET OPTIMISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Robert William c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
LIU, Wenlong c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
LOWE, Christopher c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 18825945.1 | 13.12.2018 | [2021/39] | WO2018EP84788 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119904 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884377 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/658 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
G06F8/658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERUNG DES PATCH-PUFFERVERSATZES IN SITU | [2021/39] | English: | IN PLACE PATCH BUFFER OFFSET OPTIMISATION | [2021/39] | French: | OPTIMISATION DE DÉCALAGE DE TAMPON DE PIÈCE EN PLACE | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 21.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005088448 (RED BEND LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 4 ** page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 4 *; | [XI]US2017090901 (BAINVILLE ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0148] * * figures 1-2 * [I] 2-15,17 | by applicant | US6018747 | WO2018054496 |