EP3732849 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING A USER TERMINAL IN ORDER TO RECEIVE STREAMING PROTECTED MULTIMEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viaccess Les Collines de l'Arche, Tour Opéra C 92057 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHIRMIS, Mathieu 15 rue Charles de Montesquieu 92160 Antony / FR | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18826085.5 | 24.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018EP86857 | Priority number, date | FR20170063211 | 26.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1763211 | [2020/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019129771 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732849 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3732849 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/44 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/105 (US);
G06F21/1011 (EP,US);
G06F21/44 (EP);
H04L63/0457 (US);
H04L63/0876 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES BENUTZERENDGERÄTS ZUM EMPFANGEN VON STREAMING-GESCHÜTZTEN MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN | [2020/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING A USER TERMINAL IN ORDER TO RECEIVE STREAMING PROTECTED MULTIMEDIA CONTENT | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION DE TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR POUR LA RÉCEPTION DE CONTENUS MULTIMÉDIA PROTÉGÉS ET FOURNIS EN CONTINU | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 26.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | LU | 24.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012284797 (SELEZNEV SERGEY NIKOLAYEVICH [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1 - 3 *; | [I] - Andreas Gal, "Reconciling Mozilla's Mission and W3C EME - Mozilla Hacks - the Web developer blog", hacks.mozilla.org, (20140514), URL: https://hacks.mozilla.org/2014/05/reconciling-mozillas-mission-and-w3c-eme/, (20181005), XP055512842 [I] 1,14 * page 1 - page 6 * | [A] - ERIC HSIAOKUANG WU ET AL, "A flexible and lightweight user-demand DRM system for multimedia contents over multiple portable device platforms : Flexible Lightweight DRM", SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE., GB, (20170217), vol. 47, no. 10, doi:10.1002/spe.2479, ISSN 0038-0644, pages 1417 - 1441, XP055512820 [A] 1-16 * Summary Section 4.2.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/spe.2479 | [A] - John C. Simmons, "Content Decryption Module Interface Specification", (20140102), URL: http://download.microsoft.com/download/E/A/4/EA470677-6C3C-4AFE-8A86-A196ADFD0F78/Content%20Decryption%20Module%20Interface%20Specification.pdf, (20181005), XP055512959 [A] 1-16 * Section 1 * |