EP3737585 - LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE HEADLAMP WITH AT LEAST ONE OPTICALLY RELEVANT COMPONENT AND AN ADJUSTING SYSTEM FOR PIVOTING THE OPTICALLY RELEVANT COMPONENT ABOUT A FIRST AND A SECOND AXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/47] | ADJUSTING SYSTEM FOR PIVOTING AT LEAST ONE OPTICALLY RELEVANT COMPONENT OF A VEHICLE HEADLIGHT ABOUT A FIRST AND A SECOND AXIS | ||
[2021/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZKW Group GmbH Rottenhauser Straße 8 3250 Wieselburg / AT | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Martin Am Walde 1 3661 Artstetten / AT | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Biberstraße 22 Postfach 36 1010 Wien / AT | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 18826269.5 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/47] | WO2018EP85104 | Priority number, date | EP20180151125 | 11.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18151125 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137736 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737585 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737585 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076, B60Q1/068 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP,KR);
B60Q1/068 (US);
B60Q1/0683 (EP,KR);
B60Q1/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFER MIT ZUMINDEST EINEM OPTISCH RELEVANTEN BAUTEIL UND EINEM EINSTELLSYSTEM ZUM VERSCHWENKEN DES OPTISCH RELEVANTEN BAUTEILS UM EINE ERSTE UND EINE ZWEITE ACHSE | [2021/21] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE HEADLAMP WITH AT LEAST ONE OPTICALLY RELEVANT COMPONENT AND AN ADJUSTING SYSTEM FOR PIVOTING THE OPTICALLY RELEVANT COMPONENT ABOUT A FIRST AND A SECOND AXIS | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UN PHARE DE VÉHICULE AVEC AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT OPTIQUE ET UN SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE PIVOTER LE COMPOSANT OPTIQUE AUTOUR D'UN PREMIER AXE ET D'UN DEUXIEME AXE | [2021/21] |
Former [2020/47] | EINSTELLSYSTEM ZUM VERSCHWENKEN ZUMINDEST EINES OPTISCH RELEVANTEN BAUTEILS EINES FAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFERS UM EINE ERSTE UND EINE ZWEITE ACHSE | ||
Former [2020/47] | ADJUSTING SYSTEM FOR PIVOTING AT LEAST ONE OPTICALLY RELEVANT COMPONENT OF A VEHICLE HEADLIGHT ABOUT A FIRST AND A SECOND AXIS | ||
Former [2020/47] | SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE PIVOTER AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT OPTIQUEMENT PERTINENT D'UN PHARE DE VÉHICULE SUR UN PREMIER ET UN DEUXIEME AXE | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 20.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2018 | AL | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IE | 17.12.2021 | LU | 17.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/41] | HU | 17.12.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.12.2018 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011063866 (SHIBATA HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,11,15,16 * paragraphs [0080] - [0136]; figures 6-9 * [I] 3,8,10,12-14; | [XI]EP2724888 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9,11,14-16 * paragraphs [0032] - [0037] - [0 80] - [0120]; figures 8-11 * [I] 2,7,8,10,12,13; | [A]US2015009699 (TAKII NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]EP3048360 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0085] - [0117]; figures 8-13 * | by applicant | AT513918B |