EP3724675 - DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING LASER BEAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASPERS, Jan Niklas Augusten Str. 65 70178 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
EHLERMANN, Jens Suederoogstieg 23 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18826559.9 | 14.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP84991 | Priority number, date | DE201710222864 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017222864 | [2020/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115782 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724675 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G01S7/4814 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/2955 (EP,US);
G01S7/481 (KR);
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G02F1/29 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABLENKUNG VON LASERSTRAHLEN | [2020/43] | English: | DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING LASER BEAMS | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉVIATION DE FAISCEAUX LASER | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 15.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH01236436 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * [I] 9; | [XI]DE4007463 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 29-38 * * column 2, lines 31-32 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 14 * [I] 6-8; | [A]US2015378242 (AUXIER JASON [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016049765 (ELDADA LOUAY [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XI]US2016139266 (MONTOYA JUAN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0037] , [0060] - [0061] - [0069]; figures 1,2 * [I] 6-9 | by applicant | US2016049765 |