EP3724698 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MPS-COMPATIBLE WATER GRADIENT CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Rue Louis-d'Affry 6 1701 Fribourg / CH | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Yongxing c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 02 /
PRUITT, John Dallas c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 03 /
SAMUEL, Newton T. c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 04 /
CHIANG, Chung-Yuan c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 05 /
DRIVER-SCOTT, Angela c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 06 /
DAUENHAUER, Ciara c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | 07 /
ANAND, Rita c/o Alcon Research, Ltd. 11460 Johns Creek Parkway Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 / US | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18827236.3 | 29.11.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018IB59473 | Priority number, date | US201762598018P | 13.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762598018 P | US201762598025P | 13.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762598025 P | US201762598028P | 13.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762598028 P | US201762598029P | 13.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762598029 P | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019116141 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724698 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3724698 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/04 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G02B1/043 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02C7/049 (CN,KR,US);
C08F283/124 (CN);
B05D5/00 (US);
B29D11/00038 (EP,US);
B29D11/00048 (KR);
B29D11/00125 (US);
B29D11/00865 (EP,KR,US);
B65B55/22 (US);
C08L33/02 (US);
C08L79/04 (US);
C08L83/04 (US);
C09D133/02 (US);
G02B1/18 (US);
B05D1/18 (US);
B05D1/38 (US);
B05D3/002 (US);
B05D3/02 (US);
B05D5/10 (US);
B29K2083/00 (US);
B29K2105/0061 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F283/124, C08F226/10, C08F220/14, C08F222/102, C08F220/281, C08F220/40 (CN);
G02B1/043, C08L83/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MPS-KOMPATIBLEN KONTAKTLINSEN MIT WASSERGRADIENT | [2020/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MPS-COMPATIBLE WATER GRADIENT CONTACT LENSES | [2020/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT À GRADIENT D'EAU COMPATIBLES AVEC LES MP | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 06.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | NL | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SE | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/31] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2015166205 (QIU YONGXING [US]) [AD] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0129]; example 2 *; | [A]US2017068019 (QIAN XINMING [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * low PHMB uptake: 0.25 microgramms / lens; no polyaziridine;; examples 2,3,7-7; table 8 ** abstract * | by applicant | US3408429 | US4136250 | US4153641 | US4182822 | US4189546 | US4254248 | US4259467 | US4260725 | US4261875 | US4276402 | US4327203 | US4341889 | US4343927 | US4347198 | US4355147 | US4444711 | US4460534 | US4486577 | US4543398 | US4605712 | US4661575 | US4684538 | US4703097 | US4833218 | US4837289 | US4954586 | US4954587 | US5010141 | US5034461 | US5039761 | US5070170 | US5079319 | US5346946 | US5358995 | EP0632329 | US5387632 | US5416132 | US5449729 | US5451617 | US5486579 | US5508317 | US5583463 | US5583163 | US5665840 | US5712356 | US5760100 | US5789464 | US5843346 | US5849810 | US5849841 | US5858937 | US5894002 | US5962548 | US5981675 | US6039913 | US6165408 | US6218508 | US6221303 | US6303687 | US6367929 | US6472489 | US6479587 | US6492478 | US6627124 | US6719929 | US6762264 | US6800225 | EP1465931 | US6822016 | US6867245 | US6995192 | US7052131 | US7091283 | US7214809 | US7238750 | US7249848 | US7268189 | US7268198 | US2008015315 | US7384590 | US7387759 | US2008143958 | US2008143003 | US7423074 | US2008234457 | US2008231798 | US7521519 | US7540609 | US7572841 | US7605190 | US2010008843 | US7750079 | US7858000 | US7915323 | US7934830 | US2011134387 | US7977430 | US2012026457 | US8147897 | US2012088844 | US8231218 | US2012244088 | US2012245249 | US8367746 | US8383744 | US8409599 | US8415405 | US8420711 | US2013118127 | US8445614 | US8475529 | US8480227 | US8481662 | US8487058 | US8513325 | US8529057 | US2013337160 | US8614261 | US8642712 | US8658748 | US8703891 | US8820928 | US8865789 | US8937110 | US8937111 | US8993651 | US9011884 | US9057821 | US9057822 | US2015166205 | US9097840 | US9103965 | US9121998 | US9125808 | US9127099 | US9140825 | US9140908 | US9156934 | US9164298 | US9170349 | US9188702 | US9217813 | US2016061995 | US9296159 | US9322959 | US9322960 | US9360594 | US9475827 | US2016326046 | US9529119 | US2018100053 | US2018100038 | US10081697 |