EP3649582 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC BUILDING OF LEARNING MACHINES USING LEARNING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Darwinai Corporation 117 Shaughnessy Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 1C8 / CA | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Alexander Sheung Lai 117 Shaughnessy Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 1C8 / CA | 02 /
SHAFIEE, Mohammad Javad 117 Shaughnessy Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 1C8 / CA | 03 /
LI, Francis 117 Shaughnessy Place Waterloo Ontario N2T 1C8 / CA | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18828323.8 | 06.06.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018CA50679 | Priority number, date | US201762529474P | 07.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762529474 P | US201862623615P | 30.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862623615 P | US201815982478 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: US201815982478 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019006541 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649582 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00, G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN ERSTELLUNG VON LERNMASCHINEN MIT LERNMASCHINEN | [2020/20] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC BUILDING OF LEARNING MACHINES USING LEARNING MACHINES | [2020/20] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION AUTOMATIQUE DE MACHINES D'APPRENTISSAGE À L'AIDE DE MACHINES D'APPRENTISSAGE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012226644 (JIN WEN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [X]CN106096727 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0079] *; | [X]CN106650928 (GUANGZHOU CVTE ELECTRONIC TECH) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0106] *; | [XP]WO2018068421 (GUANGZHOU SHIYUAN ELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0106] *; | [E]US2018268296 (ZHENG BO [CN], et al) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0046] ** paragraph [0079] *; | [A] - Wilamowski Bogdan M. ET AL, "Chapter 15: Feedforward Neural Networks Pruning Algorithms", Intelligent Systems, Taylor & Francis Group, (20110304), ISBN 978-1-4398-0284-7, XP055783211 [A] 1-9 * section 15.1 * | International search | [A]US2012310618 (B FAR REZA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * Abstract; Figs. 1, 5; paragraphs [0005-0009, 0039-0067] *; | [X]US2017124487 (SZETO KIT PANG [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * Abstract; claim 1; Figs. 5A-8; paragraphs [0019-0051, 0207-0282, 0332] *; | [A] - SHAFIEE et al., "EvoNet: Evolutionary Synthesis of Deep Neural Networks", arXiv:1606.04393v1, (20160614), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1606.04393v1.pdf, XP055564233 [A] 1-10 * Entire document * | [A] - SHAFIEE et al., "Deep Learning with Darwin: Evolutionary Synthesis of Deep Neural Networks", arXiv:1606.04393v3, (20170206), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1606.04393.pdf, XP055564237 [A] 1-10 * Entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11063-017-9733-0 | by applicant | US2012226644 | CN106096727 | CN106650928 | - "Chapter 15: Feedforward Neural Networks Pruning Algorithms", WILAMOWSKI BOGDAN M. et al., Intelligent Systems, Taylor & Francis Group |