EP3650922 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY DEVICE, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY SYSTEM, MOBILE BODY, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 612-8501 / JP | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSAFUKA, Kaoru c/o Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu 612-8501 / JP | [2023/47] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
KUSAFUKA, Kaoru c/o Kyocera Corporation 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18828429.3 | 02.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018JP25068 | Priority number, date | JP20170132221 | 05.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017132221 | [2020/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019009243 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650922 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3650922 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02F1/13, H04N13/125, G02B30/26, H04N13/31, H04N13/317, G02B30/00, H04N13/10, H04N13/30, H04N13/305, H04N13/366, H04N13/398 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G02B30/26 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (US);
G02B27/01 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (US);
G02F1/13 (EP);
H04N13/125 (EP);
H04N13/305 (EP);
H04N13/31 (EP);
H04N13/317 (EP);
H04N13/366 (EP);
H04N13/398 (EP);
B60K35/23 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | G02B27/01, G02F1/13, H04N13/125, G02B30/26, H04N13/31, H04N13/317, G02B30/00, H04N13/10, H04N13/30 | ||
Former IPC [2020/20] | G02B27/22, G02B27/01, G02F1/13, H04N13/125 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, DREIDIMENSIONALES ANZEIGESYSTEM, MOBILER KÖRPER UND DREIDIMENSIONALES ANZEIGEVERFAHREN | [2020/20] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY DEVICE, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY SYSTEM, MOBILE BODY, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY METHOD | [2020/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL, SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL, CORPS MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | Translation filed | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007078923 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [Y] 3,4,6-10 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]US2008117233 (MATHER JONATHAN [GB], et al) [Y] 3,4,6-10 * paragraph [0138] *; | [Y]US2010265465 (KUBARA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0119] *; | [XY]US2014320614 (GAUDREAU JEAN-ETIENNE [CA]) [X] 1,2,5,7,11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0128] * * figures 2a, 3, 7a, 7b, 9 * [Y] 3,4,6-10; | [Y]US9047711 (CHO YOUNGIL [KR], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 19, line 65 - line 67 * * column 20, line 1 - line 37 *; | [Y]US2016349507 (HAYASHI KATSUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2017109562 (SHROFF SAPNA [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,6,10* paragraph [0102] * | International search | [A]KR100813492B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-11* , entire text, fig. 3b (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014509399 (SHARP CORPORATION) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0059], [0060], fig. 31 & US 2013/0342664 A1, paragraphs [0149], [0150], fig. 31 & WO 2012/121406 A1 & CN 103403606 A *; | [A]US2015181203 (KIM HO-JAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text, fig. 9-11 & KR 10-2015-0074495 A & CN 104732932 A * | Examination | KR20130063324 | US9485488 | by applicant | JP2013214008 |