EP3650914 - OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Tomofumi c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
KOTANI, Kyosuke c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMOTO, Tatsuya c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18828441.8 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018JP25645 | Priority number, date | JP20170133089 | 06.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017133089 | [2020/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019009402 | Date: | 10.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650914 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, G01B9/02, G01J3/45, G02B7/198 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G01J3/4532 (EP,US);
G02B26/0841 (EP,CN,US);
G01B9/02051 (US);
B81B3/00 (US);
B81B3/0021 (EP,US);
B81B3/007 (US);
B81B7/02 (CN);
G01B9/02 (CN);
G01B9/02049 (US);
G01J3/0202 (US);
G01J3/021 (EP,US);
G01J3/0237 (US);
G01J3/06 (EP);
G01J3/108 (US);
G01J3/14 (US);
G01J3/45 (CN,US);
G01J3/4535 (EP,US);
G02B26/0816 (US);
G02B26/0833 (US);
G02B27/144 (US);
G02B27/146 (EP);
G02B7/182 (US);
B81B2201/033 (EP);
B81B2201/042 (EP,CN,US);
B81B2203/0154 (EP,US);
B81B2203/053 (EP);
G01B2290/25 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/20] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE | [2020/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2019 | Translation filed | 05.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2006343481 (ANRITSU CORP) [X] 1,2,8 * figure 1 * [I] 3-7; | [A]US2011090551 (PIRK TJALF [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* figure 1A * | International search | [A]US2008284078 (WOLTER ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JP2010184334 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]US2011090551 (PIRK TJALF [DE], et al)[A] 1-8; | [A]JP2015032739 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 1-8; | [A]WO2016080317 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , * | by applicant | JP20120524295 |