EP3727569 - TREATMENT OF ACUTE MEDICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galvani Bioelectronics Limited GSK Medicines Research Centre Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage SG1 2NY / GB | [2024/29] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Galvani Bioelectronics Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEW, Daniel John c/o Galvani Bioelectronics Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | 02 /
DONEGA, Matteo c/o Galvani Bioelectronics Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | 03 /
GUPTA, Isha c/o Galvani Bioelectronics Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/35] |
Former [2020/44] | Bettridge, Paul Sebastian Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18829947.3 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018GB53729 | Priority number, date | US201762608405P | 20.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762608405 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122906 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727569 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3727569 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/25, A61N1/36, A61N1/05, A61B5/021, A61B5/024 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61B5/026 (EP);
A61N1/0553 (EP,US);
A61N1/0556 (EP,US);
A61N1/205 (US);
A61N1/3606 (EP);
A61N1/36135 (EP,US);
A61N1/3616 (US);
A61N1/36171 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (EP);
A61B5/02405 (EP);
A61B5/0816 (EP);
A61N1/36017 (EP);
A61N1/36021 (EP);
A61N1/36053 (EP);
A61N1/36057 (EP);
A61N1/36114 (EP);
A61N1/36185 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | A61N1/36, A61B5/0408, A61N1/05, A61B5/021, A61B5/024 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON AKUTEN MEDIZINISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2024/10] | English: | TREATMENT OF ACUTE MEDICAL CONDITIONS | [2020/44] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES CONDITIONS MEDICALES AIGUES | [2024/10] |
Former [2020/44] | BEHANDLUNG VON AKUTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2020/44] | TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS MÉDICAUX AIGUS | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24190071.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]US2005075702 (SHAFER LISA LYNN [US]); | [Y]EP1897586 (BIOCONTROL MEDICAL LTD [IL]); | [A]US2013085537 (MASHIACH ADI [BE]); | [A]US2015174397 (BHADRA NILOY [US], et al); | [Y]US2017095679 (SOBOTKA PAUL [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005075702 | US2005075701 | US2006287678 |