EP3895320 - DATA TRANSMISSION OF VALUE PAIR IN NETWORK SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSS, Fredrik Valkyriavägen 16, 2tr 174 55 Sundbyberg / SE | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 18830009.9 | 10.12.2018 | [2021/42] | WO2018SE51267 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020122772 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895320 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/30, H04L27/34, H04W88/08 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP);
H04B1/0475 (US);
H03M7/24 (EP,US);
H04B1/10 (US);
H04L27/3444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNG VON WERTEPAAREN IN NETZWERKSYSTEMEN | [2021/42] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION OF VALUE PAIR IN NETWORK SYSTEMS | [2021/42] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DE PAIRE DE VALEURS DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE RÉSEAU | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 08.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 28.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2022 | Decision despatched | 28.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009151893 (SAMPLIFY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * paragraphs [0062] - [0064] *; | [A]CN102316517 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-33* paragraphs [0050] - [0080] *; | [Y]EP3065324 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 1-33 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010]; figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] *; | [Y] - LINTZ CHRISTENSEN E, "Block Floating Point for Radar Data", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19990101), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1109/7.745700, ISSN 0018-9251, pages 308 - 318, XP011002598 [Y] 1-33 * page 301 - page 318 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/7.745700 |