EP3765251 - SAFETY RAZOR SHAVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [2021/35] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜMKE, Alexander Eidelstedter Weg 92 20255 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
MAURER, Peter Haart 64 24534 Neumünster / DE | 03 /
KOHUT, Michaela Schopstraße 8 20255 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
HETZEL, Frank Tostedter Straße 5d 21261 Welle / DE | 05 /
STEUR, Jelte Jasker 16 8465 RH Oudehaske / NL | 06 /
VEENDIJK, Arif Opaalstoep 75 9403 SK Assen / NL | 07 /
DE VRIND, Johannes Rogier Spoorlaan 6 9753 HV Haren / NL | 08 /
SANDER, Patje Akkerstraat 4 9785BM Zuidwolde (Gn) / NL | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Beiersdorf AG Patentabteilung Unnastraße 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18830219.4 | 18.12.2018 | [2021/03] | WO2018EP85397 | Priority number, date | DE201810105823 | 13.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018105823 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174778 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3765251 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/22, B26B21/52 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
B26B21/225 (EP);
B26B21/521 (EP,US);
B26B21/22 (US);
B26B21/4018 (US);
B26B21/4025 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | RASIERSYSTEM FÜR SICHERHEITSRASIERER | [2021/03] | English: | SAFETY RAZOR SHAVING SYSTEM | [2021/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RASAGE AU RASOIR DE SÉCURITÉ | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 13.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO9955499 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 1 * * page 6, line 16 - page 10, line 30 * * figures 1-12 * [A] 2 [I] 3-8; | [XAI]WO2009027910 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 3, line 19 - page 8, line 5 * * figures 1-14 * [A] 2 [I] 3-8; | [X]US2013312265 (WILSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * figure 4 *; | [X]US2015314465 (GIANNOPOULOS PANAGIOTIS [GR], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4a,4b *; | [A]WO2017041845 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |