EP3651887 - ADAPTER FOR CONVEYING PLURAL LIQUID STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONNELLY, Patrick R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
EGELAND, Marc A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
MORIARTY, Gregory P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18831339.9 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018IB55019 | Priority number, date | US201762532391P | 14.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762532391 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012399 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651887 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01F13/00, B01F15/02, // B05C17/005, B65D81/32 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B01F33/50112 (EP,US);
B01F25/42 (US);
B01F35/717 (EP);
B01F35/7174 (US);
B05C17/00553 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | B01F5/02, B01F5/04, B01F5/06, B01F15/02, B05C17/005, B65D81/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | ADAPTER ZUM FÖRDERN MEHRERER FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRÖME | [2020/21] | English: | ADAPTER FOR CONVEYING PLURAL LIQUID STREAMS | [2020/21] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR LE TRANSPORT DE PLUSIEURS FLUX DE LIQUIDE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XIA]EP0885651 (KELLER WILHELM A [CH]) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 53 * [I] 8-9 [A] 2,7; | [XIA]US2010274279 (DELMOTTE YVES [BE]) [X] 1,3-6 * figure 19 * * paragraphs [0116] - [0119] * [I] 8-9 [A] 2,7; | [XIA]DE102013103552 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI]) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * [I] 8-9 [A] 2,7; | [XI]EP3106122 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * figures 5,6 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0054] *[I] 8-9 | International search | [X]US3980102 (KIESOW LUTZ A) [X] 1, 2, 3, 6, 7 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US4156438 (KIESOW LUTZ A [US]) [X] 1, 2, 3, 6, 7 * ; abstract; figures 2, 3; column 4, lines 30-68 * [Y] 8, 9; | [X]US4538920 (DRAKE GERALD E [US]) [X] 4, 5 * ; figures 5, 10; column 3, lines 9-20; column 4, lines 53-68; column 5, lines 1-15 *; | [A]US6523992 (BUBLEWITZ ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* ; entire document *; | [A]US2012039147 (GRETER ANDY [CH], et al) [A] 1-9 * ; entire document *; | [Y]WO2016038371 (JACKEL INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 8, 9 * ; page 9, line 27 -page 10, line 7 *; | [A]US2017120206 (HIEMER ANDREAS [CH], et al) [A] 1-9 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US4156438 | US4538920 |