EP3652341 - SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION IN BIOSENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aviana Molecular Technologies, LLC 6555 Sanger Drive, Suite 200 Orlando, Florida 32827 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Aviana Molecular Technologies, LLC 3251 Progress Drive Orlando, Florida 32826 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAS, Soumen 12001 Solon Dr. Apt 202 Orlando Florida 32826 / US | 02 /
HAMLYN, John Martin 5319 High Wheels Ct. Columbia Maryland 21044 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Symbiosis IP Limited The Innovation Centre 217 Portobello Sheffield, South Yorkshire S1 4DP / GB | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18831469.4 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US40977 | Priority number, date | US201762531238P | 11.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762531238 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019014049 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652341 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/58, C12Q1/682, G01N21/77, G01N33/543, H01L41/08 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/682 (EP,KR);
G01N15/0606 (US);
G01N21/77 (KR);
G01N33/54393 (EP,KR);
G01N33/553 (US);
G01N33/585 (EP,KR);
H10N30/00 (KR);
H10N30/302 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | C12Q1/682, G01N21/77 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERSTÄRKUNG IN EINER BIOSENSORVORRICHTUNG | [2020/21] | English: | SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION IN BIOSENSOR DEVICE | [2020/21] | French: | AMPLIFICATION DE SIGNAL DANS UN DISPOSITIF BIOCAPTEUR | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2021 | 31.07.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2024 | 31.07.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8436509 (BRANCH DARREN W [US]); | [X]WO2014143680 (RAPID DIAGNOSTEK INC [US]); | [X]WO2016130753 (DESA JOHANN [US], et al); | International search | [A]US5501986 (WARD MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US7348181 (WALT DAVID R [US], et al); | [A]US7491552 (MCDEVITT JOHN T [US], et al); | [X]US2010210032 (SHIH WEI-HENG [US], et al); | [A]US2015024414 (HARPER JASON C [US], et al) |