EP3653692 - METHOD FOR CLEANING RIGID ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA Takayuki c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18832619.3 | 13.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018JP26480 | Priority number, date | JP20170138149 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017138149 | [2020/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019013322 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653692 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/14, C11D11/00 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
C11D1/143 (EP);
C11D1/14 (US);
B08B3/08 (US);
C11D1/94 (US);
C11D17/0008 (US);
C11D3/046 (US);
C11D3/30 (US);
C11D1/46 (US);
C11D1/90 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | C11D1/14, A47L15/00, B08B3/08, C11D17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON STARREN ARTIKELN | [2020/21] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEANING RIGID ARTICLE | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NETTOYAGE D'ARTICLE DUR | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2019 | Translation filed | 11.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3808157 (DE WITT W, et al) [X] 13-16 * claim - * * example - * * column 2, line 70 - column 6, line 14 * * column 2, line 25 - line 45 * [A] 6,11 [I] 1-5,7-10,12; | [XAI]US3860528 (DEWITT WILLIAM J, et al) [X] 13-16 * claim - * * example - * * column 2, line 5 - line 24 * * column 2, line 50 - column 6, line 18 * [A] 6,11 [I] 1-5,7-10,12; | [A]WO2004050811 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * claim - * * example - ** page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 26 * | International search | [A]JPS61247799 (LION CORP) [A] 1-14 * & US 4715991 A & CN 86102800 A *; | [A]US5078916 (KOK RIEKERT [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * & EP 377261 A2 *; | [A]JP2005206835 (LION CORP) [A] 1-14 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014506945 (NOVOZYMES A/S) [A] 1-14 * & US 2014/0038876 A1 & WO 2012/110564 A1 & EP 2675882 A1 & CN 103476916 A *; | [A]JP2015028123 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-14 * & US 2014/0080751 A1 & WO 2014/046301 A2 & EP 2897575 A2 & TW 201417857 A & CN 104661637 A & KR 10-2015-0058170 A & BR 112015004920 A2 *; | [A]JP2015042707 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-14 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016147928 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-14 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016147927 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-14 * (Family: none) *; | [PA]WO2017209114 (KAO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-14* & JP 2017-214578 A & TW 201742915 A * | by applicant | US5078916 | JP2016035009 | JP2016147928 | JP2016147927 | - J. Am. Oil Chem. Soc., (19920000), vol. 69, page 39 |