EP3652926 - FRAUD DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/21] | FRAUD DETECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2023/49] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vail Systems, Inc. 570 Lake Cook Road Suite 400 Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Srinivasa 153 Farmgate Drive Schaumbergm IN 60193 / US | 02 /
WHITELEY, Todd 1560 Stablewood Lane Lake Forest IL 60045 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/21] | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 18832809.0 | 27.06.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US39770 | Priority number, date | US201715646532 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: US201715646532 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019013974 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652926 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3652926 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/51, H04M1/66, H04M1/663, H04M1/64, G06F21/50, G06M15/00, G06F21/55, G06N7/02, H04M7/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
H04M7/0078 (EP);
H04M3/2281 (US);
H04M3/2218 (US);
H04M3/42059 (EP);
H04M3/51 (US);
H04M3/5175 (EP,US);
H04M2203/551 (EP,US);
H04M2203/556 (EP,US);
H04M2203/558 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | H04M3/00, H04M3/22, H04M3/51, H04M1/66, H04M1/663, H04M1/64, G06F21/50, G06M15/00, H04M3/523, H04M3/527, G06F21/55, G06N7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BETRUGSDETEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2023/49] | English: | FRAUD DETECTION SYSTEM | [2023/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE FRAUDE | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/21] | BETRUGSDETEKTIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/21] | FRAUD DETECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2020/21] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE FRAUDE | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2023 | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007072585 (JOHNSON ERIC A [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] ** paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0085] *; | [XYI]US2014286484 (EHRLICH ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [00013] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 6-8,12 | International search | [A]US2007124246 (LAWYER JUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-20* The whole document *; | [A]US2015032624 (CLARIDGE PHILLIP GEOFFREY [GB], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-20 * The whole document *; | [A]US9552417 (OLLIGSCHLAEGER ANDREAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-20 * The whole document *; | [X]US2017111515 (BANDYOPADHYAY RAJ [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-20 * The whole document *; | [A]US2017163817 (BALLAI ADAM [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 6-20 * The whole document * | by applicant | US8897437 | US9031838 |