EP3732093 - REAR SPOILER COMPRISING AN UPPER END STOP FOR A REAR WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC, TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 Boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2022/17] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPARDON, Pascal 6 chemin Favier 01800 MEXIMIEUX / FR | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18833070.8 | 28.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018EP97065 | Priority number, date | FR20170063289 | 28.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1763289 | [2020/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019129836 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732093 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3732093 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/06, B62D65/02, B62D35/00, B60J1/18, B60J1/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
B62D65/024 (EP);
B62D35/007 (EP);
B62D65/06 (EP);
B60J1/004 (EP);
B60J1/18 (EP);
Y02T10/82 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | B62D65/02, B62D65/06, B62D35/00, B60J1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HECKSPOILER MIT EINEM OBEREN ENDANSCHLAG FÜR EIN HECKFENSTER | [2020/45] | English: | REAR SPOILER COMPRISING AN UPPER END STOP FOR A REAR WINDOW | [2020/45] | French: | BECQUET ARRIÈRE COMPRENANT UNE BUTÉE SUPÉRIEURE POUR LUNETTE | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 24.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2018 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | TR | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | IE | 28.12.2022 | LU | 28.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 28.12.2018 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MK | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 28.12.2018 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
IE | 28.12.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2012061992 (EZAKA HIDEKI [JP]) [Y] 4,6,7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0028] * * figures 1-5 *[A] 1; | [XA]JP2012201281 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11-16 * figures 1-5 * [A] 3,4,6,7,10; | [XAY]JP2015033940 (MAZDA MOTOR, et al) [X] 1-3,5,8-10 * figures 1-9 * [A] 14-16 [Y] 4,6,7; | [XAY]WO2015033077 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 9 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 8-16 [Y] 4,6,7 |