EP3727717 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A LAMINA FOR A LAMINATED CORE FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILHARM, Torsten Karlsruherstrasse 5 77815 Buehl / DE | 02 /
JOHANNING, Andre Mozartstrasse 11 76470 Oetigheim / DE | 03 /
MAURITSZ, Peter-Paul Postbus 500 5000AM Tilburg / NL | 04 /
MUTSAERS, Arnoldus Andreas Robert Burendaaldreef 25 5062LV Oisterwijk / NL | 05 /
BRANDSMA, Arjen Lombardijenlaan 225 5045WN Tilburg / NL | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Plevier, Gabriël Anton Johan Maria Bosch Transmission Technology B.V. (Engineering dept.; Patent Counsel) Postbus 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Plevier, Gabriël Anton Johan Maria Bosch Transmission Technology B.V. IP section (GS-CT/NE) postbus 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | Application number, filing date | 18833840.4 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP25331 | Priority number, date | NL20171042687 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: NL 1042687 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019120626 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727717 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/02, B21D28/22, H02K15/02 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
H02K15/02 (EP);
B21D28/02 (EP);
B21D28/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LAMELLE FÜR EINEN LAMINIERTEN KERN FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A LAMINA FOR A LAMINATED CORE FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE LAME D'UN NOYAU FEUILLETÉ D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 20.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001346344 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10242404 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP2026444 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0051]; figure - *; | [XAI]US2011154650 (HASHIMOTO AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0028] , [0048] , [0058]; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 3 [I] 5,9,10 | by applicant | DE10227129 | DE10242404 |