EP3728631 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES FROM ONE OR MORE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 10X Genomics, Inc. 7068 Koll Center Parkway, Suite 401 Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNALL-LEVIN, Michael 7068 Koll Center Parkway, Suite 401 Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18834279.4 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US67356 | Priority number, date | US201762609878P | 22.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609878 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126789 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728631 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
C12Q2525/173 (US);
C12Q2535/122 (US);
C12Q2537/149 (US);
C12Q2563/149 (US);
C12Q2563/159 (US);
C12Q2563/179 (US);
C12Q2565/518 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2521/107, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLEN AUS EINER ODER MEHREREN ZELLEN | [2020/44] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES FROM ONE OR MORE CELLS | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE MOLÉCULES D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE PROVENANT D'UNE OU DE PLUSIEURS CELLULES | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 20.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2023 | Decision despatched | 21.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014028537 (10X TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [A]US2014378322 (HINDSON BENJAMIN [US], et al); | by applicant | US2010105112 | US2014155295 | US2014378345 | US2015292988 | US2015376609 |