EP3668336 - HAND WORN INTERFACE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plexus Immersive Corp 100 Broadway San Francisco, California 94111 / US | For all designated states Hogbin, Matthew 112a London Road St Albans Herts London, Hertfordshire AL1 1NX / GB | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGBIN, Matthew 112a London Road St Albans Herts London, Hertfordshire AL1 1NX / GB | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Langley, Peter James Origin Limited Twisden Works Twisden Road London NW5 1DN / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18834630.8 | 19.07.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018US42975 | Priority number, date | US201762534413P | 19.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762534413 P | US201762535991P | 24.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762535991 P | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019018702 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668336 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/20, A43B23/02, A61B5/103, A61B5/11, A61F2/10, A61L27/50, G06F1/16, G06F3/01 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/014 (EP,US);
G01B7/30 (US);
G01R27/2611 (US);
G06F1/163 (EP);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | A43B13/20, A43B23/02, A61B5/103, A61B5/11, A61F2/10, A61L27/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | HANDGETRAGENE SCHNITTSTELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2020/26] | English: | HAND WORN INTERFACE DEVICE | [2020/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE PORTÉ À LA MAIN | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2016070347 (MCMILLEN KEITH A [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0051]; figure 3 * [Y] 8,10; | [XYI]JP2016130940 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1,3-7,11 * the whole document * [Y] 8,10 [I] 2,9,12-15; | [Y]US2016363997 (BLACK GLENN [US], et al) [Y] 8* paragraphs [0064] - [0066] - [0 84]; figure 12 *; | [IY]US2017168567 (REESE SHAWN P [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0061] - [0106]; figures 4, 5, 14, 15 * [Y] 8,10; | [XYI]US2017176267 (KELLER SEAN JASON [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0083]; figures 5A, 6A-6G, 9 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 2,3,9,12-15 | International search | [A]US6126373 (YEE ALBERT G [US], et al) [A] 1-14* , entire document *; | [A]US2001020140 (KRAMER JAMES F [US]) [A] 1-14 * , entire document *; | [X]US2014238153 (WOOD ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-7, 10, 12-13 * , entire document *; | [X]US9104271 (ADAMS RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1, 4, 8-9, 11, 14 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016161301 (GUENTHER PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * , entire document * | by applicant | JP2016130940 | US2017176267 |