EP3656276 - ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Takashi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18834655.5 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018JP22360 | Priority number, date | JP20170139138 | 18.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017139138 | [2020/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019017115 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656276 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/018, A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
A61B1/00098 (EP,US);
A61B1/00042 (EP,US);
A61B1/00066 (EP,US);
A61B1/00101 (US);
A61B1/00128 (US);
A61B1/00147 (US);
G02B23/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP | [2020/22] | English: | ENDOSCOPE | [2020/22] | French: | ENDOSCOPE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2020 | Translation filed | 15.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0759730 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1-5,10-13 * paragraphs [0027] - [0055]; figures 5-13 *; | [X]JPH0919401 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-5,10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1302151 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,11-13* paragraphs [0070] - [0082] - [0127] - [0154] - [0170] - [0178]; figures 6-9,20-24,27 *; | [X]WO2017011535 (COGENTIX MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0070]; figures 1-13 * | International search | [A]JPH07184893 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0050], fig. 1-18 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005027901 (FUJINON CORP) [A] 1-15* , paragraphs [0001]-[0040], fig. 1-6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007151595 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0144], fig. 1-43 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009268523 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0059], fig. 1-11 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH06315458 | EP1759626 | EP1759626 |