EP3656812 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FOAM RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIYAMA, Tomoya c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 02 /
HANEDA, Hidekazu c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18834901.3 | 10.07.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018JP25972 | Priority number, date | JP20170140029 | 19.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017140029 | [2020/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019017239 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656812 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/30, C08F236/12 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
C08J9/30 (EP,US);
C08J9/228 (KR);
C08F236/12 (EP);
C08J2201/026 (EP);
C08J2309/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHAUMSTOFFKAUTSCHUK | [2020/22] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FOAM RUBBER | [2020/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MOUSSE DE CAOUTCHOUC | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2020 | Translation filed | 07.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 05.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6051616 (BALK ROELOF [DE], et al) | International search | [A]JPS5641212 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-6* , *; | [A]JPH09104715 (UBE CYCON LTD) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2005320464 (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]WO2009145009 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2012121979 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JP2016160273 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-6 * , * | by applicant | JP4741837B |