EP3658900 - OPTICAL REJECTION PHOTONIC STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum-Si Incorporated 530 Old Whitfield Street Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHBERG, Jonathan M. 215 Uncas Point Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 02 /
SCHMID, Gerard 140 Wildrose Avenue Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 03 /
GONDARENKO, Alexander 16187 NW Hildago Lane Portland, OR 97229 / US | 04 /
BEACH, James 1501 Resaca Blvd. Austin, TX 78738 / US | 05 /
PRESTON, Kyle 461 Maupas Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 06 /
GHASEMI, Farshid 373 New Whitfield St. Apt. B Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 07 /
LACKEY, Jeremy 636 Nortontown Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 08 /
JEWELL, Jack 550 Aurora Avenue Boulder, CO 80302 / US | 09 /
FIFE, Keith G. 635 Matadero Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 10 /
KABIRI, Ali 58 Green Hill Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18839142.9 | 23.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US43333 | Priority number, date | US201762536268P | 24.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762536268 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019023146 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658900 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, H01L27/146, G02B5/30, H01L25/16, H01L27/144 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/1443 (EP);
G02B6/1225 (KR,US);
G01N21/6454 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/648 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/08 (KR,US);
G02B5/20 (KR,US);
G02B5/3025 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/02323 (KR,US);
H01L25/167 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | G01N21/64, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | PHOTONISCHE STRUKTUREN MIT OPTISCHER ABWEISUNG | [2020/23] | English: | OPTICAL REJECTION PHOTONIC STRUCTURES | [2020/23] | French: | STRUCTURES PHOTONIQUES À REJET OPTIQUE | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008081769 (HASSIBI ARJANG [US]) [Y] 7-9,11,12* figure 6 *; | [XYI]US2016084761 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0244] , [ 255] - [0286] - [0393] - [0400]; figures 3-1B,3-2,4-2,7-3 * [Y] 7-9,11,12 [I] 6; | [XYI]US2017082544 (VAN DORPE POL [BE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0081] - [0108]; figures 1A,1B,1C,1D,2-6; claims 1,12-16 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 6,12 | International search | [A]US6437345 (BRUNO-RAIMONDI ALFREDO EMILIO [CH], et al) [A] 1-3, 35, 37* , entire document *; | [A]US6825921 (MODLIN DOUGLAS N [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 35, 37 * , entire document *; | [A]US2007188750 (LUNDQUIST PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 35, 37 * , entire document *; | [X]US2015141267 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 35, 37 * , FIG. 12-1b; para [0010], [0011], [0030], [0146], [0147], [0179], [0187], [0370]-[0372] *; | [A]US2016041095 (ROTHBERG JONATHAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 35, 37 * , entire document * | by applicant | US2008081769 | US2016084761 | US2017082544 |