EP3662275 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EVALUATING TOXIC GAS SENSORS USING ELECTROCHEMICAL IMPEDANCE SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Scientific Corporation 1 Life Way Pittsburgh PA 15205-7500 / US | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINSMORE, Jonathan, Eric 2406 Marion Street Aliquippa, Pennsylvania 15001 / US | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18840535.1 | 20.07.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018US43093 | Priority number, date | US201762540733P | 03.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762540733 P | US201715791557 | 24.10.2017 Original published format: US201715791557 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019027701 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662275 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/02, G01N33/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G01N33/0006 (EP,US);
G01N27/026 (EP,US);
G01N27/404 (US);
G01N27/4163 (US);
G01N33/007 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | G01N27/407 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG VON TOXISCHEN GASSENSOREN UNTER VERWENDUNG ELEKTROCHEMISCHER IMPEDANZSPEKTROSKOPIE | [2020/24] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EVALUATING TOXIC GAS SENSORS USING ELECTROCHEMICAL IMPEDANCE SPECTROSCOPY | [2020/24] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉVALUATION DE CAPTEURS DE GAZ TOXIQUES EMPLOYANT UNE SPECTROSCOPIE D'IMPÉDANCE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO9918430 (CITY TECH [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,11-14 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 7 * * page 2, lines 18-25 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 15 * * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 23 * * page 13, lines 8-18 * [A] 6-9 [I] 2,3,10,15; | [XI]US2011199094 (LOU YIMING [US]) [X] 1,6,11 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0037] * [I] 2-5,7-10,12-15; | [A]US2017184527 (NOGUEIRA KEITH [US], et al) [A] 6-9* paragraphs [0245] - [0254] * | International search | [XY]WO9918430 (CITY TECH [GB], et al) [X] 1, 4, 5, 10-13, 18-20 * , pg 1, In 18-19; pg 2, In 1-4, 6-7, 9-12, 18-21; pg 6, In 8; pg 8, In 17-23; pg 9, In 23-25, 27-28; pg 10, In 9-16, 22-24; pg 11, In 1-4, 7-13; pg 12, In 7-15; pg 12, In 24 to pg 13, In 2; pg 14, In 3-8; pg 15, In 12-13; Fig 1 * [Y] 2, 3, 6-9, 14-17, 21-28; | [A]WO0014523 (COMINCO LTD [CA]) [A] 1-28 * , entire document *; | [Y]US6428684 (WARBURTON P RICHARD [US]) [Y] 3, 15-17 * , para [0070] *; | [A]US2008214910 (BUCK HARVEY B [US]) [A] 1-28 * , entire document *; | [A]US2008289959 (WEST STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-28* , entire document *; | [Y]US2015101937 (WOO LETA YAR-LI [US], et al) [Y] 2 * , para [0041]-[0042], [0045]; Fig 1 *; | [Y]US2017067848 (CHANDRASEKHAR PRASANNA [US], et al) [Y] 23-28 * , para [0001], [0049]-[0051], [0085]; Fig 1-3, 24 *; | [Y]US2017181672 (NOGUEIRA KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 6-9, 14, 21, 22, 24, 26 * , Fig 5; para [0013]-[0015], [0179], [0280]-[0281], [0408], [0620] * | by applicant | WO9918430 | US6428684 | US7413645 | US7959777 | US2011199094 | US19330625407 |