EP3647417 - ATP PHOSPHORIBOSYLTRANSFERASE MUTANT AND L-HISTIDINE PRODUCTION METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Cheiljedang Corporation CJ Cheiljedang Center 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Myung Keun 330, Dongh-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | 02 /
KWON, Nara 330, Dongh-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Jin Nam 330, Dongh-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18841909.7 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018KR08778 | Priority number, date | KR20170098205 | 02.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170098205 | [2020/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019027267 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3647417 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N15/77, C12P13/24, C12R1/15 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C12Y204/02017 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/1077 (EP,KR);
C12P13/24 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12N15/77 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | C12N9/10, C12N15/77, C12P13/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | ATP-PHOSPHORIBOSYLTRANSFERASE-MUTANTE UND L-HISTIDIN-HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2020/19] | English: | ATP PHOSPHORIBOSYLTRANSFERASE MUTANT AND L-HISTIDINE PRODUCTION METHOD USING SAME | [2020/19] | French: | MUTANT DE L'ATP PHOSPHORIBOSYLTRANSFÉRASE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE L-HISTIDINE FAISANT APPEL À CELUI-CI | [2020/19] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2020 | Translation filed | 30.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3009505 (CHINESE ACAD INST MICROBIOLOGY [CN]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - ROBERT K. KULIS-HORN ET AL, "Histidine biosynthesis, its regulation and biotechnological application in Corynebacterium glutamicum", MICROBIAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, GB, (20130425), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1111/1751-7915.12055, ISSN 1751-7915, pages 5 - 25, XP055367989 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1751-7915.12055 | International search | [A]JP2005160474 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] 1-8; | [A]EP1647593 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP])[A] 1-8; | [A]US2009275089 (KLYACHKO ELENA VITALIEVNA [RU], et al) [A] 1-8; | [A] - ZHANG, YUN, "Genetic and biochemical characterization of Corynebacterium glutamicum ATP phosphoribosyltransferase and its three mutants resistant to feedback inhibition by histidine", Biochimie, (20120000), vol. 94, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biochi.2011.11.015, pages 829 - 838, XP055312834 [A] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biochi.2011.11.015 | [A] - SCHENDZIELORZ, GEORG, "Taking control over control: use of product sensing in single cells to remove flux control at key enzymes in biosynthesis pathways", ACS Synthetic Biology, (20130000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 21 - 29, XP055586492 [A] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/sb400059y | [A] - KULIS-HORN, ROBERT K., "Corynebacterium glutamicum ATP-phosphoribosyl transferases suitable for 1-histidine production-Strategies for the elimination of feedback inhibition", Journal of Biotechnology, (20150000), vol. 206, pages 26 - 37, XP055586496 [A] 1-8 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2015.04.001 | [A] - MIZUKAMI, TORU, "Cloning of the ATP phosphoribosyl transferase gene of Corynebacterium glutamicum and application of the gene to L-histidine production", Bioscience , Biotechnology, and Biochemistry, (19940000), vol. 58, no. 4, pages 635 - 638, XP008055320 [A] 1-8 | by applicant | WO2014029376 | - PEARSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - RICE et al., "EMBOSS: The European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", Trends Genet., (20000000), vol. 16, doi:10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2, pages 276 - 277, XP004200114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02024-2 | - DEVEREUX, J. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, page 387 | - ATSCHUL, [S.] [F., J MOLEC BIOL, (19900000), vol. 215, page 403 | - CARLLLO, SIAM J Applied Math, (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - NEEDLEMAN et al., J Mol Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math, (19810000), vol. 2, page 482 | - GRIBSKOV et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19860000), vol. 14, page 6745 | - Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, National Biomedical Research Foundation, (19790000), pages 353 - 358 | - Biochimie, (20120300), vol. 94, no. 3, pages 829 - 38 |