EP3732471 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE NONDESTRUCTIVE TESTING OF A WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For all designated states Université Paris-Est Créteil Val de Marne 61 avenue du Général de Gaulle 94010 Creteil Cedex / FR | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEULEMANS, Johann 146, Boulevard Diderot 75012 PARIS / FR | 02 /
IBOS, Laurent 26, Avenue Claude DEBUSSY 94430 CHENNEVIERES SUR MARNE / FR | 03 /
FEUILLET, Vincent 9, Rue de Capri 75012 PARIS / FR | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18842434.5 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018FR53449 | Priority number, date | FR20170063377 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1763377 | [2020/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019129959 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732471 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/18 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
G01N25/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN PRÜFUNG EINER WAND | [2020/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE NONDESTRUCTIVE TESTING OF A WALL | [2020/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE NON DESTRUCTIF D'UNE PAROI | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 29.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2663745 (REIMS CHAMAPGNE ARDENNE UNIVER [FR]); | [A]WO2014000397 (CHINA CHINA ACADEMY OF BUILDING RES [CN], et al); | [A]FR2994742 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XI]WO2016124870 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]); | [A]JP2017125754 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO, et al) |