EP3731968 - A CONTAINER AND COOLER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instrunor AS Torneveien 25 1454 Fagerstrand / NO | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Instrunor AS Hakonskastet 5 1453 Bjornemyr / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LJUNGMANN, Øystein Helge Skorhaugveien 9 1400 Ski / NO | 02 /
LJUNGMANN, Torstein Lise Maries vei 25 1450 Nesoddtangen / NO | 03 /
HASSEL, John-Erik Skokleheia 23 1452 Nesoddtangen / NO | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Bryn Aarflot AS Patent Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [2020/45] | Application number, filing date | 18842673.8 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/45] | WO2018NO50319 | Priority number, date | NO20170002059 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: NO 20172059 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019132665 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3731968 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L7/00, B01L9/06 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
B01L7/00 (EP,US);
B01L9/06 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,US);
B01L2200/026 (EP);
B01L2300/045 (EP,US);
B01L2300/048 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0809 (EP,US);
B01L2300/18 (US);
B01L2300/1894 (EP);
G01N2035/00346 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER UND KÜHLERANORDNUNG | [2020/45] | English: | A CONTAINER AND COOLER ARRANGEMENT | [2020/45] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE RÉCIPIENT ET DE REFROIDISSEUR | [2020/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/49] | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6251686 (STUDER EDWARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2012329143 (YAMAZAKI MOTOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0033]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2013224851 (LJUNGMANN OYSTEIN HELGE [NO], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0086]; figure 8 *; | [X]US2014216059 (MOORE THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0047]; figures 1-7 * |