EP3729921 - SECURITY ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allbro (Pty) Ltd 121, 13th Avenue Anderbolt Extension 32 Boksburg 1459 / ZA | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMPRECHT, Quintin 121, 13th Avenue Anderbolt Extension 32 1459 Boksburg / ZA | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18842734.8 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018IB60403 | Priority number, date | ZA20170008734 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: ZA 201708734 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019123352 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729921 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3729921 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/06 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
H05K5/063 (EP);
H05K5/0208 (US);
H05K5/0221 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSGEHÄUSE | [2020/44] | English: | SECURITY ENCLOSURE | [2020/44] | French: | BOÎTIER DE SÉCURITÉ | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/44] | ENCEINTE DE SÉCURITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 21.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2023 | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SE | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
CZ | 08.02.2023 | ||
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 08.02.2023 | |
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 08.02.2023 | |
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 08.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5145087 (WEGER JR KENNETH F [US]) [A] 2-4* figure 6 *; | [Y]US5310075 (WYLER CRAIG S [US]) [Y] 1-10,19-21 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 2, lines 3-12 * * column 2, lines 50-52 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, lines 11-16 * * column 4, lines 41-45 *; | [Y]US5845433 (WALSH MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 1-10,19-21 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 1, lines 6-15 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 40 * * column 4, lines 42-46 * * column 4, lines 62-65 * * column 5, line 5 - column 7, line 2 *; | [A]CN201125009Y (HANGZHOU ONTIME ELECTRONIC TEC [CN]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,7 *; | [A]WO2011011821 (LOKAWAY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 2-4,21 * figures 1-4 *; | [A] - Keystone Electronic Solutions, "Unique digital lock combines GSM, GPS and induction to provide robust remote locking solution", (20130221), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.kses.net/media/20130221%20Unique%20digital%20lock%20combines%20GSM,%20GPS%20and%20induction.pdf, XP002790545 [A] 14,16-18 * the whole document * |