EP3673028 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALUMINA SINTERED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAISHI, So C/O SHOWA DENKO CERAICS CO.,LTD Shiojiri Plant, 1 Oaza Soga, Shiojiri-shi, Nagano, 3996461 / JP | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18842854.4 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018JP47990 | Priority number, date | JP20170248431 | 25.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017248431 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019131818 | Date: | 04.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673028 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3673028 | Date: | 10.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, C04B35/111, C04B41/85 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C04B41/85 (EP,KR);
C04B35/111 (EP,KR);
C04B35/10 (US);
C04B35/1115 (EP,KR);
C04B35/6281 (EP,KR);
C04B35/62886 (EP,KR);
C04B35/6325 (US);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP,KR);
C04B41/5007 (EP,KR);
C09K3/1436 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/3205 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/3215 (US);
C04B2235/3217 (US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/48 (US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/616 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/656 (US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/728 (US);
C04B2235/78 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/783 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/786 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/788 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/96 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (EP);
C04B41/5007, C04B41/4535, C04B2103/001 (EP);
C04B41/5007, C04B41/4535, C04B2103/0011 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ALUMINIUMOXIDSINTERELEMENTS | [2020/27] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALUMINA SINTERED BODY | [2020/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS FRITTÉ EN ALUMINE | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 27.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2018 | AL | 10.02.2021 | CY | 10.02.2021 | CZ | 10.02.2021 | DK | 10.02.2021 | EE | 10.02.2021 | ES | 10.02.2021 | FI | 10.02.2021 | HR | 10.02.2021 | LT | 10.02.2021 | LV | 10.02.2021 | MC | 10.02.2021 | MK | 10.02.2021 | MT | 10.02.2021 | NL | 10.02.2021 | PL | 10.02.2021 | RO | 10.02.2021 | RS | 10.02.2021 | SK | 10.02.2021 | SM | 10.02.2021 | BG | 10.05.2021 | NO | 10.05.2021 | GR | 11.05.2021 | IS | 10.06.2021 | PT | 11.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 10.02.2021 | ||
CY | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
MK | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.12.2018 | |
AL | 10.02.2021 | ||
CY | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
CY | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 10.02.2021 | |
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 10.02.2021 | |
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 10.02.2021 | |
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2001322865 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * * example - * * table - * [I] 1-8; | [XDI]JP2004307239 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [XD] 1,2,4,6-8 * abstract * * claim - * * example - *[I] 1-8 | by applicant | JPH0987008 | JP2004026513 | JP2004307239 | JP2009102181 | - J. Mat. Sci., (19930000), vol. 28, pages 5953 - 56 |