EP3666267 - COMBINATION PRODUCT CONTAINING A LIMONOID COMPOUND AND METFORMIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | COMPOSITE PRODUCT CONTAINING LIMONIN COMPOUND AND BIGUANIDE COMPOUND | ||
[2023/25] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZHEJIANG YANGSHENGTANG INSTITUTE OF NATURAL MEDICATION CO., LTD. No.181 Geyazhuang Zhuantang Street Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310024 / CN | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Zhejiang Yangshengtang Institute Of Natural Medication Co., Ltd. No.181 Geyazhuang Zhuantang Street Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310024 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dong No.181 Geyazhuang Zhuantang Street Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310024 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Quan No.181 Geyazhuang Zhuantang Street Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310024 / CN | 03 /
HU, Liu No.181 Geyazhuang Zhuantang Street Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310024 / CN | 04 /
XUE, Lian No.181 Geyazhuang Zhuantang Street Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310024 / CN | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/25] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18842956.7 | 13.07.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN95615 | Priority number, date | CN201710670354 | 08.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710670354 | [2020/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029319 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666267 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666267 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/155, A61K31/366, C07J73/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61K31/7048, A61K31/585, A61P3/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/155 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/585 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,CN,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/585, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2021/20] | A61K31/155, A61K31/366, C07J73/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61K31/7048 | ||
Former IPC [2020/25] | A61K31/155, A61K31/366, C07J73/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSPRODUKT ENTHALTEND EINE LIMONOIDVERBINDUNG UND METFORMIN | [2023/25] | English: | COMBINATION PRODUCT CONTAINING A LIMONOID COMPOUND AND METFORMIN | [2023/25] | French: | PRODUIT DE COMBINAISON CONTENANT UN COMPOSÉ LIMONIDE ET DE LA METFORMINE | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/25] | ZUSAMMENGESETZTES PRODUKT MIT LIMONINVERBINDUNG UND BIGUANIDVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2020/25] | COMPOSITE PRODUCT CONTAINING LIMONIN COMPOUND AND BIGUANIDE COMPOUND | ||
Former [2020/25] | PRODUIT COMPOSITE CONTENANT UN COMPOSÉ DE LIMONINE ET UN COMPOSÉ DE BIGUANIDE | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2020 | Translation filed | 08.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 11.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN105950184 ; | [XI]US2012177730 (BARON ALAIN D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * paragraphs [0394] , [0400] , [0489] , [0521] , [1206] - [1211] - [1221] - [1224] * * table page 68 * [I] 5,6,12-14; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2017, no. 08, Database accession no. 2016-676777, XP002802615 & CN105950184 A 20160921 (MENG G) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN101330921 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [A] 1-10; | [X]CN102481276 (ELCELYX THERAPEUTICS INC) [X] 1-10; | [X]CN103402358 (ELCELYX THERAPEUTICS INC) [X] 1-10; | [XY]CN103597071 (ELCELYX THERAPEUTICS INC) [X] 1-10 [Y] 7; | [A]WO2014049366 (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB]) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2014203059 (KGK SYNERGIZE INC [CA]) [A] 1-10; | [Y]CN106132425 (KIKKOMAN CORP) [Y] 7; | [A] - chongde et al, "extraction,identification and determination of natural limonin and nomolin from citrus fruits", journal of chinese institute of food science and technology, (20140331), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.16429/j.1009.2001.01.02, pages 6 - 11, XP055658776 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.16429/j.1009.2001.01.02 | by applicant | - LI NAN et al., "Protective effect of pine pollen on kidney damage in diabetic nephropathy mice", Science and Technology Review, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 4/5, pages 95 - 99 | - ZHANG JIYUAN et al., "Study on the effect of three plant extracts on improving glucose and lipid metabolism in type 2 diabetic mice", Food and Machinery, (20160000), vol. 32, no. 12, pages 142 - 147 |