EP3662296 - DETECTING LOCATION WITHIN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie MO 63368 / US | [2020/46] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | ||
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | ||
Former [2020/24] | For all designated states Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Unit 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOTTON, John c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 02 /
WOOTTON, Matthew c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 03 /
NISSMAN, Chris c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 04 /
PRESTON, Victoria c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 05 /
CLARK, Jonathan c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 06 /
MCKINNEY, Justin c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 07 /
BARNES, Claire c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 08 /
XIAO, Xinyu c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | 09 /
WANG, Zhecan c/o Ivani, LLC 79 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
WOOTTON, John c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | ||
02 /
WOOTTON, Matthew c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
03 /
NISSMAN, Chris c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
04 /
PRESTON, Victoria c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
05 /
CLARK, Jonathan c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
06 /
MCKINNEY, Justin c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
07 /
BARNES, Claire c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
08 /
XIAO, Xinyu c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
09 /
WANG, Zhecan c/o Ivani, LLC 9 Hubble Drive, Suite 105 Dardenne Prairie, MO 63368 / US | |||
Former [2020/24] | 01 /
WOOTTON, John 6 Forsythia Lane St. Louis MO 63132 / US | ||
02 /
WOOTTON, Matthew 2336 Macklind Ave. St. Louis, MO 63110 / US | |||
03 /
NISSMAN, Chris 2371 N. Emerald Lake Ct. Tuscon AZ 85749 / US | |||
04 /
PRESTON, Victoria 3262 Rolling Road Edgewater MD 21037 / US | |||
05 /
CLARK, Jonathan 1910A Cherokee Street St. Louis MO 63118 / US | |||
06 /
MCKINNEY, Justin 636 Strecker Rd. Wildwood, MO 63011 / US | |||
07 /
BARNES, Claire 904 Eastgate Ave University City MO 63130 / US | |||
08 /
XIAO, Xinyu 5500 Wabash Ave Terre Haute IN 47803 / US | |||
09 /
WANG, Zhecan 1000 Olin Way Needham MA 02492 / US | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18842993.0 | 08.08.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018US45835 | Priority number, date | US201715674328 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: US201715674328 | US201715674487 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: US201715674487 | US201715713219 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: US201715713219 | US201715713309 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: US201715713309 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019032718 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662296 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G08B13/187, G08B13/24, // G01P13/00, G01S13/04 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
G01S5/0278 (EP,KR);
G01P13/00 (EP,KR);
G01S13/04 (EP,KR);
G08B13/2491 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | G01P13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG DER POSITION INNERHALB EINES NETZWERKS | [2020/24] | English: | DETECTING LOCATION WITHIN A NETWORK | [2020/24] | French: | DÉTECTION DE POSITION AU SEIN D'UN RÉSEAU | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004003591 (IT HOEJSKOLEN [DK], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]JP2005535950 (IT HOEJSKOLEN; ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009229318 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2012146788 (WILSON ANTHONY JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0054]; figures 1-3b * [I] 4-12; | [A]JP2012190161 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013162459 (AHARONY NADAV [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0054] - [0055] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2014004874 (SCHWARTZ STEVEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2015052475 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2015527573 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017078811 (IVANI LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0110] - [0112] * * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005535950 (IT UNIVERSITY OF COPENHAGEN) [A] 1-20, 48-60* , whole document & AU 2003239787 A & EP 1516207 A1 & US 2004/0080415 A1 & WO 2004/003591 A1 *; | [A]JP2009229318 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-20, 48-60 * , whole document (No Family) *; | [X]US2012146788 (WILSON ANTHONY JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-20, 48-60 * , paragraphs 0028, 0073 & CA 2820947 A & EP 2652996 A1 & WO 2012/082758 A1 *; | [A]JP2012190161 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-20, 48-60 * , whole document (No Family) *; | [A]US2013162459 (AHARONY NADAV [US], et al) [A] 1-20, 48-60 * , whole document (No Family) *; | [A]JP2015052475 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-20, 48-60 * , whole document (No Family) *; | [A]JP2015527573 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION) [A] 1-20, 48-60 * , whole document & EP 2868123 A1 & US 2014/0004874 A1 & WO 2014/004464 A2 *; | [A]WO2017078811 (IVANI LLC [US]) [A] 1-20, 48-60 * , whole document & CA 2998842 A & CN 108351431 A & EP 3341763 A2 & US 9474042 B1 * |