EP3666005 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRECODER DETERMINATION AND PRECODER MATRIX INDICATOR (PMI) INDICATION FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVYDOV, Alexei Lenin Ave 28/11-40 Nizhny Novgorod NIZ 603132 / RU | 02 /
ZHANG, Yushu 8F Raycom Info Park A No.2 Kexueyuan South Road Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
SERGEEV, Victor 9 Delovaya St. Apt. 310 Nizhny Novgorod NIZ 603163 / RU | 04 /
WANG, Guotong Rongke Building A Beijing 100084 / CN | 05 /
YAN, Leiqin Global Trade Center 36 3rd Ring Rd East Dong Cheng Flr 18-20 Tower D 2 Crtyrd Beijing 100013 / CN | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18843491.4 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN98959 | Priority number, date | WO2017CN96660 | 09.08.2017 Original published format: PCT/CN2017/096660 | WO2018CN71778 | 08.01.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/071778 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029480 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666005 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04W72/04 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04B7/0456 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (US);
H04L25/03343 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W80/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRECODER-BESTIMMUNG UND PRECODER-MATRIXINDIKATOR (PMI)-ANZEIGE FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2020/25] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRECODER DETERMINATION AND PRECODER MATRIX INDICATOR (PMI) INDICATION FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE PRÉCODEUR ET D'INDICATION D'INDICATEUR DE MATRICE DE PRÉCODAGE (PMI) POUR UNE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/16] | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Non-codebook based transmission for UL MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1709923, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051299148 [X] 1,2,6-10,14,15 * section 3; page 4 - page 5; figure 2 * | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Codebook based transmission for UL MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170617), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710447, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170617), XP051305045 [X] 1,2,6-10,14,15 * section 4; page 6 - page 8; figure 5 * * section 5; page 8 * | [XI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "On Codebook Based UL Transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1704719 ON CODEBOOK BASED UL TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051242857 [X] 1,2,6,10,14,15 * section 2 "UL Codebook" * * section "Control Signaling"; page 3 * [I] 3-5 | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "PRB bundling and precoding granularity in UL DMRS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens; 20170213 - 20170218, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1702914, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051210058 [X] 1,10,14 * section 2; page 1 - page 2 * * section 3; page 2 - page 3 * [I] 11-13 | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "DMRS-based spatial multiplexing for UL NR MIMO", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1612479 NR UL TX SCHEME, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051176427 [X] 1,10,14 * section 3; page 4 - page 5; figure 2 * [I] 11-13 | [X] - SAMSUNG, "DCI Contents for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1707995 DCI CONTENTS FOR NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170514), XP051273192 [X] 1,10,14 * section 2 "MIMO aspects"; page 1 - page 2 * * table 1 * | International search | [Y]US2015124732 (SEO HANBYUL [KR], et al) [Y] 2-11, 14, 15, 18-25 * description, paragraph [0190] *; | [A]US2015207646 (NILSSON THOMAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2016021642 (KIM HYUNGTAE [KR], et al) [X] 1, 12, 13, 16, 17 * description, paragraphs [0112]-[0121] and figure 11description, paragraphs [0112]-[0121] and figure 11 * [Y] 2-11, 14, 15, 18-25; | [A]US2016373229 (YOU HYANGSUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Physical layer procedures for data channels(Release 15)", 3GPP TS 38.214 V0.0.01, (20170731), XP055571835 [A] 1-25 * , the whole document * |