EP3666981 - EXCAVATOR, EXCAVATOR ASSIST DEVICE, AND EXCAVATOR MANAGEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1 Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGA, Masato c/o SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. Yokosuka Works 19 Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8555 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18844460.8 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018JP29356 | Priority number, date | JP20170153670 | 08.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017153670 | [2020/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031431 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666981 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666981 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/26, A61B5/16, A61B5/18, E02F9/24, E02F3/32 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
E02F9/24 (EP);
E02F9/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/16 (EP);
A61B5/6887 (US);
A61B5/7246 (US);
B60K28/06 (US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/0022 (EP,KR);
A61B2503/22 (US);
B60N2210/24 (EP,KR);
B60N2210/30 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | E02F9/26, A61B5/16, A61B5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAGGER, BAGGERHILFSVORRICHTUNG UND BAGGERVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/25] | English: | EXCAVATOR, EXCAVATOR ASSIST DEVICE, AND EXCAVATOR MANAGEMENT DEVICE | [2020/25] | French: | EXCAVATRICE, DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE D'EXCAVATRICE ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'EXCAVATRICE | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2020 | Translation filed | 06.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5931254 (LORAAS ORLAN J [US], et al); | [IY]US2007203630 (VITALE ANDREW J [US], et al); | [Y]JP2015071318 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]EP2878263 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2003058742 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY); | [Y]JP2010111292 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2012030696 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2015071318 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]JP2016018314 (NTT COMM CORP); | [Y]JP2016133849 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [YA]JP2016186812 (MICO LATTA INC); | [Y]JP2017065428 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | JP2011038346 | JP2017153670 |