EP3668127 - METHOD FOR INDICATING RESOURCE POSITION FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST MESSAGES, NETWORK DEVICE, USER TERMINAL, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yumin 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/25] | 01 /
WU, Yumin 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18844959.9 | 07.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN99122 | Priority number, date | CN201710687216 | 11.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710687216 | [2020/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029511 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668127 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/0453, H04L5/00, // H04W4/06, H04W48/12, H04W48/16 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04L5/0092 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,CN);
H04W72/30 (EP,US);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/535 (CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE DER RESSOURCENPOSITION ZUM EMPFANGEN VON RUNDFUNKNACHRICHTEN, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG, BENUTZERENDGERÄT UND SYSTEM | [2020/25] | English: | METHOD FOR INDICATING RESOURCE POSITION FOR RECEIVING BROADCAST MESSAGES, NETWORK DEVICE, USER TERMINAL, AND SYSTEM | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION DE POSITION DE RESSOURCES POUR RECEVOIR DES MESSAGES DE DIFFUSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU, TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR ET SYSTÈME | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | Translation filed | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 24.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - PANASONIC, "On default bandwidth part", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170630), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710787, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, XP051299991 [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15 * Section "2.1 Necessity of DL default bandwidth part", subsection "DL BW part for initial access to obtain minimum system information"; Section "2.2 Obtain DL BW part configuration".;; figure 1 * [I] 5,11 | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Further Details on Wider Bandwidth Operations in NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, P.R. China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710796_FURTHER DETAILS ON WIDER BANDWIDTH OPERATIONS IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CED, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051300000 [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15 * Sections 2.2 - 2.4 * [I] 5,11 | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "Remaining details on multiple SS block transmissions in wideband CC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710626 MULTIPLE SS BLOCKS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051299833 [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15 * Section "1 Introduction"; section "2.4 Contents and Behavior of multiple SS Blocks", subsection "PBCH contents of multiple SS Blocks" * [I] 5,11 | International search | [A]CN101159975 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-36 * entire document *; | [A]CN101841769 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-36 * entire document *; | [X]CN102195745 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-36 * description, paragraphs [0007]-[0022] *; | [A]US2014010169 (NOVAK ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-36* entire document * |