EP3668814 - BEVERAGE DISPENSING SYSTEM FOR SPORTS DRINKS WITH PERSONALIZED HYDRATION SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company Patents One Coca-Cola Plaza NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANASSCHE, Raymond 130 Laurel Ridge Drive Alpharetta, Georgia 30004 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Franchot 11 Elan Court Marietta, Georgia 30068 / US | 03 /
SCHWARBER, Joshua 8208 Jefferson Square Court Decatur, Georgia 30030 / US | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18847009.0 | 16.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018IB56183 | Priority number, date | US201762546339P | 16.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762546339 P | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019035043 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668814 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07F13/06 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/0537 (EP);
B67D1/0882 (KR,US);
B67D1/0888 (US);
B67D1/0015 (KR);
G07F13/065 (EP);
B67D1/0021 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | B67D1/08, B67D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEABGABESYSTEM FÜR SPORTGETRÄNKE MIT PERSONALISIERTEN HYDRATATIONSLÖSUNGEN | [2020/26] | English: | BEVERAGE DISPENSING SYSTEM FOR SPORTS DRINKS WITH PERSONALIZED HYDRATION SOLUTIONS | [2020/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE BOISSON POUR BOISSONS DE SPORT COMPRENANT DES SOLUTIONS D'HYDRATATION PERSONNALISÉES | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016157749 (BOHORQUEZ JOSE L [US], et al) [A] 4* abstract *; | [A]US2017225936 (JERSEY STEVEN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0114] * * figure 12 * | International search | [A]US2007073557 (ABRAMSON FREDRIC D [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0042]; and claims 1-25. *; | [X]US2011121032 (DEO INDRANI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0013], [0021]-[0079]; claims 1-12; and figures 1-7. *; | [A]US2016090288 (GIVENS JR BARRY MAURICE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0062]-[0079]; and figure 2. *; | [A]WO2016141322 (KUVEE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0086]; and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2017022043 (NEWMAN DAVID ROY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0028]-[0092]; and figures 1, 2A-2D, 3. * | by applicant | US2011121032 |