EP3668424 - ELECTROMAGNETIC INTRAMEDULLARY NAIL SCREW POSITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Austofix Group Limited 18 Kinkaid Avenue North Plympton, S.A. 5037 / AU | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGMAN, Anthony, Mark c/- 18 Kinkaid Avenue North Plympton, South Australia 5037 / AU | 02 /
HENRY, Chris c/- 18 Kinkaid Avenue North Plympton, South Australia 5037 / AU | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18847029.8 | 14.08.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018AU00134 | Priority number, date | AU20170903273 | 15.08.2017 Original published format: AU 2017903273 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019033141 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668424 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/17, A61B17/72, A61B34/20, A61B90/11, A61B90/90, A61B90/96, // A61B17/00, A61B34/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A61B90/90 (EP);
A61B17/1707 (EP,AU,US);
A61B17/1725 (EP,AU,US);
A61B17/7241 (AU,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B90/11 (EP);
A61B90/94 (US);
A61B90/96 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00115 (US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/564 (US);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,AU,US);
A61B2034/2072 (AU,US);
A61B2034/256 (AU);
A61B90/98 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | A61B17/17, A61B17/72, A61B34/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHRAUBENSYSTEM ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES MARKNAGELS | [2020/26] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC INTRAMEDULLARY NAIL SCREW POSITIONING SYSTEM | [2020/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MISE EN PLACE DE CLOU-VIS INTRAMÉDULLAIRE ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 19.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0589592 (ORTHOFIX SRL [IT]) [A] 1-9* figures 1,2,7 *; | [YA]CN2671510Y (QI JIANYONG [CN]) [Y] 8,9 * page 13, line 21 - line 30 * * figures 1,15 * [A] 1-7; | [A]US2005261700 (TUMA GREGOR [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2010129141 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 4,5,8 *; | [XYI]WO2012109760 (TRAUMIS SURGICAL SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0142] , [0144] , [0238] * * figures 1,26 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 3,4,6 | International search | [A]US5584838 (RONA MEHMET [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * Figure 1, 2, 8, 12 and 13; abstract, column 4 line 44 - 50, column 8 line 21 - 23, and column 14 line 31 - 32 *; | [A]US2005070916 (HOLLSTIEN DAVID STUART [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * Figure 1 and 5; abstract, and paragraph [0001], [0030] and [0038] *; | [A]US2005080427 (GOVARI ASSAF [IL], et al) [A] 1-16 * Figure 7, 9 - 11; and paragraph [0032], [0086], [0088], [0094], [0100] and [0102] *; | [A]US2005261700 (TUMA GREGOR [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract, and paragraph [0014 - 0015] and [0021] *; | [A]US2009088756 (ANDERSON PETER [US]) [A] 1-16 * Figure 1 - 7; abstract, and paragraph [0020 - 0021], [0025], [0033], [0038], [0042] and [0045 - 0047] *; | [A]US2010152573 (RITCHEY NICHOLAS S [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * Figure 25 -29; and paragraph [0134], [0136-0139], [0147 - 0148] and [0150] *; | [A]WO2012051512 (VIRGINIA TECH INTELL PROP [US], et al) [A] 1-16* Figure 5, 6, 9, 12A, 13 and 15A - 15C; abstract, p 10 line 9 - 14, p 16 line 5 - 7, p 12 line 9 - 12, p 20 line 26 - 28, p 21 line 6 - 9, and p 28 line 21 - 25 * | by applicant | AU20170903273 |