EP3674487 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 16-1, HigashiUeno 2-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0015 / JP | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHINO, Kazunori c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
TOMITA, Kunitsugu c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Satoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
YAMANOBE, Yousuke c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 05 /
TORIYAMA, Youhei c/o Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18847324.3 | 24.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018JP31448 | Priority number, date | JP20170161633 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017161633 | [2020/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019039606 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674487 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/26, G01G19/16, G01G23/365, E02F9/22, E02F9/20 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
E02F9/2221 (EP);
E02F9/26 (KR,US);
G01G19/16 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2029 (EP);
G01G19/02 (US);
G01G23/365 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | E02F9/26, G01G19/16, G01G23/365 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE | [2020/27] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2020/27] | French: | ENGIN DE CHANTIER | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2019 | Translation filed | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2016159839 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP AB [SE]) [Y] 1-6,9 * page 1, lines 4,5 * * abstract; figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 8 - line 26 * * page 6, line 18 - line 20 * * page 8, line 21 - line 24 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 12 *[A] 7,8; | [YA]JP6042358B (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1-6,9 * paragraphs [0023] , [ 0022] , [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0049] , [0053] , [0056] , [ 0057] * * paragraphs [0012] , [0030] * [A] 7,8 | International search | [A]JPS5851096B [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JP3761149B [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JP2014101701 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]WO2016092684 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JP2013113044 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JPH0570091B (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [A] 7 * , * | by applicant | JPS6042358B |