EP3598855 - POSITIONING STRUCTURE AND FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kunshan Go-Visionox Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. Building 4 No. 1 Longteng Road Development Zone KunShan City, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2024/16] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Kunshan Go-Visionox Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. Building 4 No. 1 Longteng Road Development Zone KunShan City, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Tan Building 4 No.1 Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Zhan Building 4 No.1 Longteng Road Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18847835.8 | 27.04.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018CN84881 | Priority number, date | CN20172162229U | 23.08.2017 Original published format: CN 201721062229 U | [2020/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019037460 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3598855 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3598855 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, // H05K3/00 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
H05K1/0277 (EP,US);
H05K1/0281 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/0366 (KR,US);
H05K1/11 (KR);
H05K1/16 (KR);
H05K3/32 (KR);
H05K3/42 (KR);
H05K3/4679 (KR,US);
H05K1/028 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,US);
H05K2201/2009 (EP,US);
H05K2201/2027 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/04] | H05K1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNGSSTRUKTUR UND FLEXIBLE LEITERPLATTE | [2020/04] | English: | POSITIONING STRUCTURE AND FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT BOARD | [2020/04] | French: | STRUCTURE DE POSITIONNEMENT ET CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ FLEXIBLE | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | Translation filed | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 23.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5585157 (TAGUCHI FUMIYA [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,10 * column 3, lines 8-39; figures 1A, 1B, 2 * [I] 4-7,9; | [XI]US6150614 (MILLER BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 44; figure - *[I] 4-7,9 | International search | [A]JPH0760917B (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. et al.) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [XY]CN201616955U (SHANGHAI TIANMA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [X] 1, 2, 5, 9, 10 * , description, paragraphs [0040]-[0048], and figures 5-7, description, paragraphs [0040]-[0048], and figures 5-7 * [Y] 3-8, 10; | [X]CN203194007U (ZHOU WEIQING) [X] 1, 2, 5, 9, 10 * , description, paragraphs [0013]-[0018], and figure 2 *; | [X]CN203279331U (3WIN FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT ZHUHAI CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 5, 9, 10 * , description, paragraphs [0012]-[0014], and figure 2 *; | [Y]CN205283935U (CHANGZHOU AOHONG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 3-8, 10 * , description, paragraphs [0009]-[0010], and figure 1 * |