EP3672512 - CATHETERS AND MANIPULATORS WITH ARTICULABLE ENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transmural Systems LLC 4 Dundee Park Drive Suite 101 Andover, MA 01810 / US | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20852-7660 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lederman, Robert J. 3916 Underwood Street Chevy Chase, Maryland 20815 / US | 02 /
Khan, Jaffar Building 10, Room B1D219,10 Cemter Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | 03 /
Rogers, Toby Building 10, Room B1D219,10 Cemter Drive Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | 04 /
Rafiee, Nasser 4 Dundee Park Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 05 /
MacDonald, Stuart 4 Dundee Park Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 06 /
House, Morgan 4 Dundee Park Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Hancox, Jonathan Christopher Venner Shipley LLP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 18848165.9 | 27.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018US48177 | Priority number, date | US201762550347P | 25.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762550347 P | US201762567203P | 02.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762567203 P | US201862663518P | 27.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862663518 P | US201862688378P | 21.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862688378 P | US201862712194P | 30.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862712194 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019040943 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672512 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61M25/00, A61B34/00, A61B17/32, A61B17/04, A61B17/221, A61B17/3205, A61B17/00, A61B18/00, A61B34/30, A61B90/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/06, A61F2/24, A61B17/22 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP);
A61B17/320016 (EP);
A61B17/320092 (EP);
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61M25/0041 (EP);
A61M25/0662 (EP);
A61B17/0469 (EP);
A61B17/0482 (EP);
A61B17/221 (EP);
A61B17/32056 (EP);
A61B2017/00243 (EP);
A61B2017/00783 (EP);
A61B2017/00853 (EP);
A61B2017/22044 (EP);
A61B2017/320069 (EP);
A61B2017/320073 (EP);
A61B2017/320093 (EP);
A61B2018/00166 (EP);
A61B2018/00279 (EP);
A61B2018/00369 (EP);
A61B2018/00601 (EP);
A61B2018/1412 (EP);
A61B2018/144 (EP);
A61B2018/1475 (EP);
A61B2034/301 (EP);
A61B2034/303 (EP);
A61B2090/033 (EP);
A61B2090/3966 (EP);
A61F2/24 (EP);
A61M2025/015 (EP);
A61M2025/0681 (EP);
A61M25/0032 (EP);
A61M25/0068 (EP);
A61M25/0097 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | A61B18/14, A61M25/00, A61B34/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | KATHETER UND MANIPULATOREN MIT GELENKIGEN ENDEN | [2020/27] | English: | CATHETERS AND MANIPULATORS WITH ARTICULABLE ENDS | [2020/27] | French: | CATHÉTERS ET MANIPULATEURS À EXTRÉMITÉS ARTICULÉES | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]WO2018009718 (REVIVE MEDICAL LLC [US]) [XP] 1,2,11-14 * paragraphs [0019] , [0023] , [0040] , [0042] - [0044] - [0047] , [0050]; figures 4,5,7-10 * [A] 3-10; | [A]US4493320 (TREAT MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE10037660 (CURATIVE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-5,11-14 *; | [A]DE202010016945U (OSYPKA PETER [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]DE10037660 (CURATIVE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-41 * , abstract, fig. 4-6, paragraphs [0006], [0039] - [0041] *; | [Y]DE202010016945U (OSYPKA PETER [DE]) [Y] 1-27, 30, 33-41 * , abstract, fig. 2, paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]US9282993 (COHEN ADAM [US], et al) [Y] 28-41 * , abstract, fig. 2, col. 3, line 11 - col. 30, line 43, col. 33, line 20 - col. 34, line 39 *; | [Y]EP3175813 (HANSEN MEDICAL INC [US]) [Y] 35-38, 40 * , fig. 1, abstract * | by applicant | WO2018009718 | US6030360 | US6579278 | US2013211510 | US8530783 | US5605543 | WO2017117092 | US6296636 | US6514267 | US2013310853 | US6464683 | US5538510 | US7785318 | US6488694 | US5906619 | US19880109690 |