EP3674280 - BISPHENOL COMPOSITION CONTAINING AROMATIC ALCOHOL SULFONATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, POLYCARBONATE RESIN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND BISPHENOL PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Kei c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Takayuki c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
KONISHI, Rie c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 04 /
HIROWATARI, Kazuo c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 05 /
OONO, Takaharu c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18848469.5 | 22.08.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018JP31033 | Priority number, date | JP20170159687 | 22.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017159687 | JP20170234313 | 06.12.2017 Original published format: JP 2017234313 | [2020/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019039520 | Date: | 28.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674280 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/20, C07C39/16, C07C39/17, C08G64/08, C07C309/42 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
C08G64/307 (EP);
C07C39/17 (EP,KR,US);
C07C37/685 (US);
B01J27/053 (US);
C07C37/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07C37/88 (KR);
C07C39/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08G64/06 (EP);
C08G64/081 (KR);
C08G64/20 (US);
C07C2527/053 (US);
C07C2601/14 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (EP,US);
C07C37/20, C07C39/17 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2020/27] | C07C37/88, C07C37/20, C07C39/16, C07C39/17, C08G64/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | BISPHENOL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM AROMATISCHEN ALKOHOLSULFONAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, POLYCARBONATHARZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND BISPHENOLHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/27] | English: | BISPHENOL COMPOSITION CONTAINING AROMATIC ALCOHOL SULFONATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, POLYCARBONATE RESIN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND BISPHENOL PRODUCTION METHOD | [2020/27] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BISPHÉNOL CONTENANT UN SULFONATE D'ALCOOL AROMATIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BISPHÉNOL | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2020 | Translation filed | 20.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 08.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JP2014040376 (SHIPRO KASEI KAISHA LTD) [XD] 1-7* paragraph [0002]; example 1 * | International search | [XA]JPH06135875 (HONSHU CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [XA]JPH1045649 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [A]JPH10236998 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-16 * , examples & US 5763686 A1, examples & EP 847975 A1 & DE 69702890 T & ES 2148908 T & SG 71741 A & CN 1185427 A *; | [A]JP2000239204 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-16 * , examples (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2003221352 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [XA]JP2006036685 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [A]JP2006124331 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-16 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2007099741 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [XA]JP2008115139 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1, 3-9 * , paragraph [0024] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [XA]JP2009161438 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples & WO 2007/116967 A1 & TW 200745007 A * [A] 2, 10-16; | [XA]WO2011049021 (ASAHI ORGANIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 10-16 * , examples, paragraphs [0023], [0055], [0060] & JP 2011-105699 A & US 2012/0232240 A1, examples, paragraphs [0027], [0079], [0084] & CN 102639476 A & KR 10-2012-0086320 A & TW 201134800 A * [A] 1-9; | [XA]JP2014040376 (SHIPRO KASEI KAISHA LTD) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [XA]JP2015051935 (TAOKA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1, 3-9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 10-16; | [EX]JP2018145178 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP ) [EX] 1-16 * , examples (Family: none) *; | [EX]JP2018145177 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP ) [EX] 1-16 * , examples (Family: none) *; | [EX]JP2018145176 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP ) [EX] 1-16* , examples (Family: none) *; | [A] - SHIMANOUCHI Norimitsu, "Synthesis of Bisphenol A", NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI- Te Chemical Society of Japan, (19820000), vol. 8, pages 1363 - 1370, XP055577689 [A] 1-16 | by applicant | JPS62138443 | JP2008214248 | JP2014040376 | JP2015051935 | - Makromol. Chem., (19650000), vol. 88, page 215 |